This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2020 at 08:24:56 (UTC).

MCFALL v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 MCFALL filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against MERCK CO , INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is HARVEY BARTLE, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-20330

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HARVEY BARTLE, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVELYN MCFALL

Defendants

MCKESSON CORP

MERCK SHARP AND DOHME CORP.

MERCK & CO., INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARGARET CORDNER

Attorney at MARC J BERN & PARTNERS LLP

60 East 42Nd Street, Suite 950

New York, NY 10165

DEBRA J. HUMPHREY

Attorney at MARC J BERN & PARTNERS LLP

One Grand Central Plane, 60 E 42Nd Street, Suite 950

New York, NY 10165

Defendant Attorneys

LISA CARNEY ELDRIDGE

Attorney at CLARK HILL PLC

Two Commerce Square, 2001 Market St., Ste 2620

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JASON SARUYA

Attorney at CLARK HILL PLC

2001 Market Street, Suite 2620

Philadelphia, PA 19103

DINO S. SANGIAMO

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

750 E Pratt St Ste 900

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MCKESSON CORP., MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP AND DOHME CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10118972) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EVELYN MCFALL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #2 Summons MERCK, #3 Summons MSD, #4 Summons MCKESSON)(CORDNER, MARGARET) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/18/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet CCS

#11

(#11) McKesson's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MCKESSON CORP.(ELDRIDGE, LISA) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

1 #3

Summons MSD

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP AND DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #2

Summons MERCK

#10

(#10) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MCKESSON CORP.(ELDRIDGE, LISA) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MCKESSON CORP., MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP AND DOHME CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by DEBRA J. HUMPHREY on behalf of EVELYN MCFALL (HUMPHREY, DEBRA) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP AND DOHME CORP..(SANGIAMO, DINO) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by JASON SARUYA on behalf of MCKESSON CORP (SARUYA, JASON) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#3

(#3) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-49) transferring case to the USDC for the EDPA. (dm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:19-cv-20431. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #4

Summons MCKESSON

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by EVELYN MCFALL served Summons and Complaint upon MCKESSON CORP. (HUMPHREY, DEBRA) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

4 #1

*Restricted*

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) McKesson's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MCKESSON CORP.(ELDRIDGE, LISA) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MCKESSON CORP.(ELDRIDGE, LISA) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by JASON SARUYA on behalf of MCKESSON CORP (SARUYA, JASON) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP AND DOHME CORP..(SANGIAMO, DINO) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by DEBRA J. HUMPHREY on behalf of EVELYN MCFALL (HUMPHREY, DEBRA) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by EVELYN MCFALL served Summons and Complaint upon MCKESSON CORP. (HUMPHREY, DEBRA) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP AND DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:19-cv-20431. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-49) transferring case to the USDC for the EDPA. (dm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MCKESSON CORP., MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP AND DOHME CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against MCKESSON CORP., MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP AND DOHME CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10118972) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EVELYN MCFALL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #2 Summons MERCK, #3 Summons MSD, #4 Summons MCKESSON)(CORDNER, MARGARET) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.