This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2020 at 08:09:38 (UTC).

Chandler McFall et al v. Perrigo Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Chandler McFall filed an Other lawsuit against Perrigo Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-07752

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chandler McFall

Kailey McDonald

Defendants

Walmart Inc.

Perrigo Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gillian L Wade

Attorney at Milstein Jackson Fairchild and Wade LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

David F Slade

Attorney at Carney Bates and Pulliam PLLC

519 West 7Th Street

Little Rock, AR 72201

Joseph Henry Bates, III

Attorney at Carney Bates and Pulliam PLLC

519 West 7Th Street

Little Rock, AR 72201

Scott Edelsberg

Attorney at Edelsberg Law PA

20900 Ne 30Th Avenue Suite 417

Aventura, FL 33180

Sara D Avila

Attorney at Milstein Jackson Fairchild and Wade LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Marc Alexander Castaneda

Attorney at Milstein Adelman Jackson Fairchild and Wade LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Ricky L Shackelford

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1840 Century Park East Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2121

Hannah Beth Shanks-Parkin

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1840 Century Park East Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2121

Samuel D Sazer

Attorney at Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo PC

44 Montgomery Street 36Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Daniel J Herling

Attorney at Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo PC

44 Montgomery Street 36Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Nicole Ozeran

Attorney at Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo PC

2029 Century Park East Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Adam B Korn

Attorney at Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo PC

2029 Century Park East Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#25

#24

#23

#22

21 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Perrigo Company's Motion to Dismiss

21 #1

Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Perrigo

#21

#20

#19

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Perrigo Company, Walmart Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Chandler McFall, Kailey McDonald(Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Samuel D. Sazer counsel for Defendant Perrigo Company. Adding Samuel D. Sazer as counsel of record for Perrigo Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Perrigo Company. (Attorney Samuel D. Sazer added to party Perrigo Company(pty:dft))(Sazer, Samuel) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Perrigo Company's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint #21 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Perrigo Company's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Perrigo Company. (Ozeran, Nicole) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Perrigo Company's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by defendant Perrigo Company. Motion set for hearing on 11/12/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Perrigo Company's Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Perrigo Company's Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint) (Ozeran, Nicole) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Perrigo Company, identifying Perrigo Company plc. (Ozeran, Nicole) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicole Ozeran counsel for Defendant Perrigo Company. Adding Nicole V. Ozeran as counsel of record for Perrigo Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Perrigo Company. (Attorney Nicole Ozeran added to party Perrigo Company(pty:dft))(Ozeran, Nicole) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Adam B Korn counsel for Defendant Perrigo Company. Adding Adam B. Korn as counsel of record for Perrigo Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Perrigo Company. (Attorney Adam B Korn added to party Perrigo Company(pty:dft))(Korn, Adam) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel J Herling counsel for Defendant Perrigo Company. Adding Daniel J. Herling as counsel of record for Perrigo Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Perrigo Company. (Attorney Daniel J Herling added to party Perrigo Company(pty:dft))(Herling, Daniel) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #12 Non-Resident Attorney David F. Slade APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Kailey McDonald and Chandler McFall, designating Gillian L. Wade as local counsel. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott Edelsberg on behalf of Plaintiffs Kailey McDonald, Chandler McFall (Attorney Scott Edelsberg added to party Kailey McDonald(pty:pla), Attorney Scott Edelsberg added to party Chandler McFall(pty:pla))(Edelsberg, Scott) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07752 FMO(MRWx). (rn) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Perrigo Company and Walmart Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Kailey McDonald, Chandler McFall. (Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Gillian L. Wade re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Regarding Venue filed by Plaintiffs Kailey McDonald, Chandler McFall. (Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Kailey McDonald, Chandler McFall, (Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Kailey McDonald, Chandler McFall. (Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27784819 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Chandler McFall, Kailey McDonald. (Attorney Gillian L Wade added to party Kailey McDonald(pty:pla), Attorney Gillian L Wade added to party Chandler McFall(pty:pla))(Wade, Gillian) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERRIGO CO., PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam B Korn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole Ozeran