This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2022 at 08:06:12 (UTC).

McFadden v. Warden et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 McFadden filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Warden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine A. Robertson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-30062

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine A. Robertson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tedkieya McFadden

Chicopee, MA 01105

Defendants

Warden

Pullen

Hess

Nash

Constance

T. Smith

Connie Burke

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Tedkieya McFadden. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Tedkieya McFadden. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#4

(#4) Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered.within 35 days of this Memorandum and Order, McFadden shall (1) either file (i) an Amended Petition that identifies her habeas claims and the relief she seeks; or (ii) a Civil Complaint; and (2) either shall (i) pay the applicable filing fee; or (ii) file an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified prison account statement showing account activity for the six months preceding the filing of this lawsuit (the lawsuit was filed on May 11, 2022). The Clerk shall terminate the pending Motion to Appoint Counsel (Dkt. No 2) because it is a duplicate copy of McFaddens petition and provide to McFadden a a blank Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (AO 240), a blank Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (AO 242), and a blank Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights (Prisoner) (Pro Se 14). (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Exhibit Exhibits

#6

(#6) Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiff Tedkieya McFadden. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION by Tedkieya McFadden. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Tedkieya McFadden. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiff Tedkieya McFadden. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 against All Defendants, filed by Tedkieya McFadden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered.within 35 days of this Memorandum and Order, McFadden shall (1) either file (i) an Amended Petition that identifies her habeas claims and the relief she seeks; or (ii) a Civil Complaint; and (2) either shall (i) pay the applicable filing fee; or (ii) file an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified prison account statement showing account activity for the six months preceding the filing of this lawsuit (the lawsuit was filed on May 11, 2022). The Clerk shall terminate the pending Motion to Appoint Counsel (Dkt. No 2) because it is a duplicate copy of McFaddens petition and provide to McFadden a a blank Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (AO 240), a blank Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (AO 242), and a blank Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights (Prisoner) (Pro Se 14). (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Tedkieya McFadden. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Tedkieya McFadden. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NASH INDIVIDUALLY LARRY L. is a litigant

Latest cases where HESS is a litigant

Latest cases where WARDEN is a litigant