This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2023 at 09:27:29 (UTC).

McDuffie v. Ethicon Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 McDuffie filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard W. Story. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05063

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard W. Story

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marshall McDuffie

Defendants

Ethicon Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Slater

Attorney at Slater, Slater & Schulman

445 Broad Hollow Road, Suite 419

Melville, NY 11747

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26 Requirements for Record Preservation and Prima Facie Evidence of Implant, Injury and Causation. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/13/2021. (rsg) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER MODIFYING #2 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/26/2022. (rsg) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#4

(#4) SECOND QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/26/2022. (rsg) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SECOND QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/26/2022. (rsg) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER MODIFYING #2 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/26/2022. (rsg) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26 Requirements for Record Preservation and Prima Facie Evidence of Implant, Injury and Causation. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/13/2021. (rsg) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Marshall McDuffie. (Direct Filed MDL) (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-12280587) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less