This case was last updated from PACER on 03/20/2021 at 16:53:53 (UTC).

McDowell v. Randolph County, Alabama et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 McDowell filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Randolph County, Alabama. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerusha T. Adams, Kelly F. Pate and Emily C. Marks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00839

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly F. Pate

Presiding Judges

Jerusha T. Adams

Emily C. Marks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dale McDowell

Defendants

Joyce Adams

Randy Moore

Angela Price

Aris Murphy

Wedowee, AL 36278

Lisa Burdette

James Earl Price

Randolph County, Alabama

Bernard Sheppard

David Cofield

The Randolph County Commission

James Michael Price

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Michael Segrest

Attorney at The Segrest Law Firm

Po Box 780791

Tallassee, AL 36078

Defendant Attorneys

Kayla Michelle Wunderlich

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Ave

Montgomery, AL 36130

Brad A. Chynoweth

Attorney at State of Alabama Office of the Attorney General

501 Washington Avenue

Montgomery, AL 36130

Charles Richard Hill, Jr.

Attorney at Capell & Howard, P.C.

Post Office Box 2069

Montgomery, AL 36102-2069

Ashley Hawkins Freeman

Attorney at Capell & Howard, P.C.

Post Office Box 2069

Montgomery, AL 36102-2069

Blake Edward Brookshire

Attorney at Capell & Howard, P.C.

150 S. Perry Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

Charles David Stubbs

Attorney at Stubbs, Sills & Frye, PC

P. O. Box 2023

Anniston, AL 36202

Joshua Jonathan Jackson

Attorney at Samford & Denson, LLP

Po Box 2345

Opelika, AL 36803-2345

Kevin W. R. Bufford

Attorney at Samford & Denson LLP

709 Ave A

Opelika, AL 36801

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #56 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Randy Moore, Bernard Sheppard. (Hill, Charles) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) MOTION to Dismiss by Randy Moore, Bernard Sheppard. (Hill, Charles) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #54 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joyce Adams, Lisa Burdette. (Chynoweth, Brad) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Joyce Adams, Lisa Burdette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - SJIS Case Detail sheet for Defendant Angela Prices small claims against Sprouse, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certified copy of Small Claims Clerk's File)(Chynoweth, Brad) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #52 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Aris Murphy. (Chynoweth, Brad) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Aris Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Murphy)(Chynoweth, Brad) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ORDER: Now pending before the Court are the Defendants' motions to dismiss (doc. #16 , #17 , and #22 ) and the Plaintiff's unopposed motion to set a briefing schedule (doc. #36 ) filed on 12/17/2020. On 2/18/2021, the Plaintiff filed an amended complaint. (Doc. #48 ). Accordingly, upon consideration of the motions, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that the motions to dismiss (doc. #16 , #17 , and #22 ) and the Plaintiff's unopposed motion to set a briefing schedule (doc. #36 ) are DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 2/23/2021. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of #50 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Randy Moore. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #50 for pdf) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Randy Moore. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Stubbs, Charles) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ORDER: Now pending before the Court is the Defendant Aris Murphys' motion to dismiss (doc. #38 ) filed on 12/30/2020. On 1/28/2021, the Plaintiff filed an amended complaint (Doc. #48 ). Accordingly, upon consideration of the motion, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that the motion to dismiss (doc. #38 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 2/18/2021. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale McDowell; Aris Murphy served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Segrest, John) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale McDowell; Randy Moore served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Segrest, John) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale McDowell; David Cofield served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Segrest, John) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale McDowell; Lisa Burdette served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Segrest, John) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale McDowell; Joyce Adams served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Segrest, John) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Randolph County, Alabama, The Randolph County Commission, David Cofield, Bernard Sheppard, Randy Moore, Aris Murphy, Angela Price, James Earl Price, James Michael Price, Joyce Adams, & Lisa Burdette; Returned to counsel for personal service by process server.(amf, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Dale McDowell. (Segrest, John) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Dale McDowell. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dale McDowell. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #1 for pdf) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Joyce Adams, Lisa Burdette, David Cofield, Randy Moore, Aris Murphy, Angela Price, James Michael Price, James Earl Price, Randolph County, Alabama, Bernard Sheppard, The Randolph County Commission ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602059845.), filed by Dale McDowell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, ) Modified on 10/22/2020 to reflect as also filed against Defendant The Randolph County Commission (amf, ). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Michael Segrest