This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2019 at 08:34:52 (UTC).

Mcdowell v. Our Lady of the Lake et al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 Mcdowell filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Our Lady of the Lake. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. deGravelles and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00569

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gerald Mcdowell

Baton Rouge, LA 70896

Defendants

Susan Dixon

Our Lady of the Lake

Lane Regional Medical Center

Hanover Insurance Group

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) OPINION : Adopting #18 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/03/2019. (ELW) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#18

(#18) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS : regarding #1 Complaint filed by Gerald Mcdowell. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that this case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 10/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 09/19/2019. (ELW) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER denying #6 EMERGENCY URGENT MOTION REQUEST. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/18/2019. (KAH) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#23

(#23) GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order . Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/08/2019. (ELW) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#22

(#22) JUDGMENT : ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/03/2019. (ELW) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#20

(#20) OBJECTION to #18 Report and Recommendations filed by Gerald Mcdowell. (KMW) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#12

No Description Available

11 #1

Attachment

#11

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#7

(#7) ORDER denying #6 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default (KMW) Modified on 9/13/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#8

(#15) NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #8 MOTION to Sever : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#6

(#17) ORDER denying #6 EMERGENCY URGENT MOTION REQUEST. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/18/2019. (KAH) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#5

(#5) Return on Certified Mail re #4 Order Setting Spears Hearing,, (KMW) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#13

(#13) Spears Hearing Report/Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Spears Hearing held on 9/11/2019. Pla personally appeared during the hearing. The Court explained the purpose of the hearing. Pla was advised that a Report and Recommendation will be issued and that he would have fourteen days to object to the Report and Recommendation to the extent he disagrees with the findings. (KAH) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#4

(#5) Return on Certified Mail re #4 Order Setting Spears Hearing,, (KMW) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#2

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/29/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#1

(#14) MOTION for Settlement Judgment Emergency Relief and Notification Required on #1 Complaint by Gerald Mcdowell. (EDC) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order . Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/08/2019. (ELW) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) JUDGMENT : ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/03/2019. (ELW) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) OPINION : Adopting #18 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/03/2019. (ELW) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) OBJECTION to #18 Report and Recommendations filed by Gerald Mcdowell. (KMW) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Return on Certified Mail re #18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 Complaint filed by Gerald Mcdowell. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that RECOMMENDS that this case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. (KMW) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS : regarding #1 Complaint filed by Gerald Mcdowell. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that this case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 10/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 09/19/2019. (ELW) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER denying #6 EMERGENCY URGENT MOTION REQUEST. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/18/2019. (KAH) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER: The Court's notice and briefing schedule on #8 MOTION to Sever is VACATED. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 09/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #8 MOTION to Sever : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Settlement Judgment Emergency Relief and Notification Required on #1 Complaint by Gerald Mcdowell. (EDC) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER denying #6 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default (KMW) Modified on 9/13/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Strike, Sever, or Try Separately by Gerald Mcdowell. (KMW) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) EMERGENCY URGENT MOTION REQUEST, construed as a Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default and Motion for Recusal, by Gerald Mcdowell. (KMW). Added MOTION for Recusal and edited text on 9/18/2019 (BLR). (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return on Certified Mail re #4 Order Setting Spears Hearing,, (KMW) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Spears Hearing Report/Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Spears Hearing held on 9/11/2019. Pla personally appeared during the hearing. The Court explained the purpose of the hearing. Pla was advised that a Report and Recommendation will be issued and that he would have fourteen days to object to the Report and Recommendation to the extent he disagrees with the findings. (KAH) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order: IT IS ORDERED that a hearing be held in this case pursuant to Spears v. McCotter, 766 F.2d 179 (5th Cir. 1985), to determine whether all or any part of this case should be dismissed as frivolous. Plaintiff is required to attend this hearing personally. Failure to attend this hearing may result in dismissal of the plaintiff's case without further notice. Spears Hearing set for 9/11/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 08/29/2019. (ELW) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/29/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gerald Mcdowell. (KMW) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Susan Dixon, Hanover Insurance Group, Lane Regional Medical Center, Our Lady of the Lake, filed by Gerald Mcdowell.(KMW) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/28/2019 to correct page orientation) (KMW). (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.