This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2022 at 07:26:27 (UTC).

McDowell v. Bar Music Group, LLC, The et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2021 McDowell filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Bar Music Group, LLC, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M Cain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-04055

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy M Cain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Najja McDowell individually doing business as Left Field Music (BMI)

Defendants

Tremaine Neverson

Bar Music Group, LLC, The individually doing business as Bar Raising Tracks

Troy Taylor

Ezekiel Lewis

Reed Vertelney

Universal Music Publishing Group Inc

Atlantic Recording Corporation

Downtown Music Publishing LLC

Trey Songz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Sanford Wyatt

Attorney at Wyatt Law PA

935 South Main Street, Suite 203

Greenville, SC 29601

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Supporting Documents Email to opposing counsel confirming extension of time

19 #19

Main Document

18 #1

Supporting Documents Email to opposing counsel confirming extension of time

18 #18

Main Document

17 #1

Supporting Documents Atlantic Recording - Certified Mail Receipt

17 #17

Main Document

14 #1

Universal Music - Certified Mail Receipt

14 #14

Main Document

13 #1

Downtown Music - Certified Mail Receipt

13 #13

Main Document

10 #4

Exhibit D Waiver for Service of Summons Reed Vertelney

10 #3

Exhibit C Waiver for Service of Summons Ezekiel Lewis

10 #2

Exhibit B Waiver for Service of Summons Troy Taylor

10 #1

Exhibit A Waiver for Service of Summons The Bar Music Group

10 #10

Main Document

#8

(#8) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. (kmca) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bar Music Group, LLC, The, Downtown Music Publishing LLC, Ezekiel Lewis, Tremaine Neverson, Troy Taylor, Universal Music Publishing Group Inc. (kmca) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#5

(#5) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Najja McDowell.(kmca) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Universal Music Publishing Group Inc answer due 3/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Email to opposing counsel confirming extension of time)(Wyatt, David) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Downtown Music Publishing LLC answer due 3/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Email to opposing counsel confirming extension of time)(Wyatt, David) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Najja McDowell. Atlantic Recording Corporation served on 2/1/2022, answer due 2/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Atlantic Recording - Certified Mail Receipt)(Wyatt, David) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER #11 and #12 Certificates of Service. Reason: re-filed by attorney to correct event. Corrected Filing Document Number #13 & #14 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Modified filing date to that of original filing: 2/2/22. (kmca) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Najja McDowell. Universal Music Publishing Group Inc served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. (Wyatt, David) Modified on 2/4/2022: to correct date filed (kmca). (Additional attachment added on 2/8/2022: as provided by filing user: #1 Universal Music - Certified Mail Receipt) (kmca). (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Najja McDowell. Downtown Music Publishing LLC served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022, by Najja McDowell. (Wyatt, David) Modified on 2/4/2022: to remove incorrect event (acceptance of service); to correct date filed (kmca). (Additional attachment added on 2/8/2022: as provided by filing user: #1 Downtown Music - Certified Mail Receipt) (kmca). (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE by Najja McDowell. Bar Music Group LLC, The; waiver executed on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022; Ezekiel Lewis waiver executed on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022; Troy Taylor waiver executed on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022; Reed Vertelney waiver executed on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Waiver for Service of Summons The Bar Music Group, #2 Exhibit B Waiver for Service of Summons Troy Taylor, #3 Exhibit C Waiver for Service of Summons Ezekiel Lewis, #4 Exhibit D Waiver for Service of Summons Reed Vertelney)(kmca) Re-filed by clerk to correct event (kmca) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #8 Report on the Filing of Copyright to Copyright Office, 508filings@loc.gov. (kmca) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. (kmca) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bar Music Group, LLC, The, Downtown Music Publishing LLC, Ezekiel Lewis, Tremaine Neverson, Troy Taylor, Universal Music Publishing Group Inc. (kmca) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Najja McDowell.(kmca) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bar Music Group, LLC, The, Downtown Music Publishing LLC, Ezekiel Lewis, Tremaine Neverson, Troy Taylor, Universal Music Publishing Group Inc, Reed Vertelney (Filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-10238569), filed by Najja McDowell. Service due by 3/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Term Song, #2 Exhibit B - Post Term Songs, #3 Exhibit C - McDowell Masters, #4 Exhibit D - McDowell Product, #5 Exhibit E - Co-publishing Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Email from Reed Vertelney, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Objection and Accounting request, #8 Exhibit H - Additional notice of objection and accounting request, #9 Exhibit I - Notice of demand for royalties and accounting statements, #10 Exhibit J - Copyright Registrations)(kmca) (Additional attachment added on 12/16/2021: #11 Verification) (kmca). Modified on 12/17/2021: to add descriptions to exhibits as provided by filing user (kmca). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Downtown Music Publishing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Music Publishing LTD is a litigant