This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2019 at 07:45:12 (UTC).

McDougal v. Trinity Financial Services LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 a Property - Foreclosure case was filed by McDougal against Trinity Financial Services LLC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02256

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ada Brown

Referral Judge

Renee Harris Toliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Davida McDougal

Defendants

Trinity Financial Services, LLC

The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as Sucessor to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee for RASC2004-KS2

Trinity Financial Services LLC

The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason Andrew LeBoeuf

Attorney at Vilt and Associates PC

2435 N Central Expressway, Suite 1200

Richardson, TX 75080

Robert C Vilt

Attorney at Vilt and Associates PC

5177 Richmond Avenue Suite 1142

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan J Browne

Attorney at Reyes Browne Reilley OR Angel L. Reyes & Associates, P.C.

8222 Douglas Avenue, Suite 400

Dallas, TX 75225

Max M. Murphy

Attorney at Angel L. Reyes & Associates, P.C.

8222 Douglas Avenue, Suite 400

Dallas, TX 75225

Max M Murphy

Attorney at Angel L Reyes & Associates PC

8222 Douglas Avenue, Suite 400

Dallas, TX 75225

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Notice of Option to Consent to Proceed Before the Magistrate Judge. (Clerk to send Consent Form as directed.) If appropriate, party(ies) should return the signed consent form to the clerk. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/30/2019) (ndt) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#8

(#8) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/25/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/28/2019) (ndt) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association, Trinity Financial Services LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Browne, Ryan) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#3

(#3) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as Sucessor to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee for RASC2004-KS2, Trinity Financial Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Murphy, Max) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

3 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (sre) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as Sucessor to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee for RASC2004-KS2, Trinity Financial Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as Sucessor to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee for RASC2004-KS2. (Murphy, Max) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

1 #8

Exhibit(s)

1 #9

Exhibit(s)

1 #10

Exhibit(s)

1 #11

Exhibit(s)

1 #4

Exhibit(s)

1 #5

Exhibit(s)

1 #6

Exhibit(s)

1 #7

Exhibit(s)

1 #12

Cover Sheet

1 #13

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #3

Exhibit(s)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Option to Consent to Proceed Before the Magistrate Judge. (Clerk to send Consent Form as directed.) If appropriate, party(ies) should return the signed consent form to the clerk. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/30/2019) (ndt) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/25/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/28/2019) (ndt) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association, Trinity Financial Services LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Browne, Ryan) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendants' #3 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants' response is due by October 25, 2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/24/2019) (chmb) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ***PLEASE DISREGARD. DUPLICATE ENTRY.*** ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendants' #3 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants' response is due by October 25, 2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/22/2019) (chmb) Modified on 10/24/2019 (ali). (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (sre) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as Sucessor to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee for RASC2004-KS2, Trinity Financial Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Murphy, Max) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as Sucessor to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee for RASC2004-KS2, Trinity Financial Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as Sucessor to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee for RASC2004-KS2. (Murphy, Max) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law No. 1, Dallas County, case number CC-19-03859-A filed by Trinity Financial Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as Sucessor to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee for RASC2004-KS2. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10279480) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Cover Sheet, #13 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Browne, Ryan) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.