This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/01/2022 at 07:02:26 (UTC).

Terry McDonald v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Terry McDonald filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00747

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sunshine Suzanne Sykes

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terry McDonald

Defendants

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Diebold, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Susan B Grabarsky

Frank N Darras

Phillip S Bather

Defendant Attorneys

Jason A James

Patricia A Ellis

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Ellis, Patricia) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 22-110) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Sykes, Sunshine Suzanne, this case is transferred from Judge John W. Holcomb to the calendar of Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:22-cv-00747-SSS-SHKx. (dve) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Court's Standing Order and Notice to Parties filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America, identifying The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Prudential Financial, Inc. (Attorney Jason A James added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(James, Jason) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer now due 6/24/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Patricia A Ellis added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Ellis, Patricia) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald, upon Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 5/5/2022, answer due 5/26/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Intake Specialist of CT Corporation System Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#10

(#10) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:22-cv-00747 JWH(SHKx). (rn) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#8

(#8) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

7 #1

Diebold, Incorporated

7 #7

Main Document

6 #1

CV-11C

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2022
  • Docket(#18) REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Please refer to Order for complete details., (iva) (Entered: 06/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Ellis, Patricia) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 22-110) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Sykes, Sunshine Suzanne, this case is transferred from Judge John W. Holcomb to the calendar of Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:22-cv-00747-SSS-SHKx. (dve) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Court's Standing Order and Notice to Parties filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America, identifying The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Prudential Financial, Inc. (Attorney Jason A James added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(James, Jason) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer now due 6/24/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Patricia A Ellis added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Ellis, Patricia) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District John W. Holcomb. Effective Monday, May 23, 2022, Judge John W. Holcomb will be located in the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 9D, on the 9th Floor, located at 411 W. 4th Street, Santa Ana, California 92701-4516. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9D of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All required mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered and placed in the drop box located on the 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse. Judge Holcomb's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, may be reached at JWH_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald, upon Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 5/5/2022, answer due 5/26/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Intake Specialist of CT Corporation System Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:22-cv-00747 JWH(SHKx). (rn) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Diebold, Incorporated, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Diebold, Incorporated) (sh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (sh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certification & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald, (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33219818 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald. (Attorney Susan B Grabarsky added to party Terry McDonald(pty:pla))(Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less