This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2021 at 12:54:47 (UTC).

McDonald v. Peoplelink LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 McDonald filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Peoplelink LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray M Borden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-02010

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray M Borden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Talmage McDonald

Defendants

Peoplelink LLC

Sustained Quality LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Aaron Wrady

Attorney at WRADY & MICHEL LLC

505 20Th Street North, Ste. 1650

Birmingham, AL 35203

Courtney Brooks Crampton

Attorney at WRADY MICHEL & KING, LLC

505 20Th North, Ste. 1650

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Robert M Ronnlund

Attorney at SCOTT SULLIVAN STREETMAN & FOX PC

P.O. Box 380548

Birmingham, AL 35238

William A Scott, Jr

Attorney at SCOTT SULLIVAN STREETMAN & FOX PC

31 Inverness Center Pkwy

Birmingham, AL 35242

C Peter Bolvig, III

Attorney at Whitaker Mudd Luke & Wells

2011 Fourth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#9

#11

#12

#13

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants. Attorney Robert M Ronnlund and William A Scott, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 02/01/2021. (SUH) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Peoplelink LLC, Sustained Quality LLC. (Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peoplelink LLC, Sustained Quality LLC. filed by Peoplelink LLC, Sustained Quality LLC (Bolvig, C) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Peoplelink LLC, Sustained Quality LLC.(Bolvig, C) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER: Before the court is the #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants. Because a corporation cannot appear pro se in litigation and must be represented by counsel, Palazzo v. Gulf Oil Corp., 764 F.2d 1381, 1385 (11th Cir. 1985), and no other attorney has appeared for the two corporate defendants, the motion is DENIED with leave to refile when appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 01/19/2021. (SUH) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Peoplelink LLC, Sustained Quality LLC. (Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, the unopposed #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading is GRANTED. Defendants are ORDERED to file a responsive pleading by February 1, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 01/13/2021. (SUH) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Peoplelink LLC, Sustained Quality LLC. (Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by William A Scott, Jr on behalf of Peoplelink LLC, Sustained Quality LLC (Scott, William) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M Ronnlund on behalf of Peoplelink LLC, Sustained Quality LLC (Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Talmage McDonald. Sustained Quality LLC served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Crampton, Courtney) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Talmage McDonald. Peoplelink LLC served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Crampton, Courtney) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Peoplelink LLC, Sustained Quality LLC. Returned to plaintiff for service. (MEB2) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3735885 (B4601110298). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Peoplelink LLC, Sustained Quality LLC, filed by Talmage McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(KAM). (Crampton, Courtney) Modified on 12/16/2020 (MEB2). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Peoplelink LLC, Sustained Quality LLC, filed by Talmage McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(KAM) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEOPLELINK, LLC doing business as PEOPLELINK STAFFING SOLUTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William A. Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Moore Ronnlund

Latest cases represented by Lawyer C Peter Bolvig, III