This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 08:14:04 (UTC).

McDonald v. Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 McDonald filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Taylor B. McNeel and Robert P. Myers, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00094

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Taylor B. McNeel

Referral Judge

Robert P. Myers, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ethel McDonald

Defendant

Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric N. Cerra

Attorney at BRAME LAW FIRM

2781 Hwy 15, P. O. Box 301

Bay Springs, MS 39422

Defendant Attorney

Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr.

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131)

300 Concourse Blvd., SUIT 200

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt addressed to Billy G. Rayner, Clerk, showing Order and docket sheet was received by Jasper County Circuit Court on 08/10/2021. (CS) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#7

(#7) Letter to Billy G. Rayner, Circuit Clerk of Jasper County, MS, transmitting certified copies of Order to Remand and docket sheet. (LDR) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting Unopposed #5 Motion to Remand. This action is hereby remanded to the Circuit Court of the First Judicial District of Jasper County, Mississippi. Signed by District Judge Taylor B. McNeel on 8/5/2021. (LDR) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

5 #1

Exhibit A

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Service of Request for Admissions by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan (Mansfield, Kenna) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan (Mansfield, Kenna) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt addressed to Billy G. Rayner, Clerk, showing Order and docket sheet was received by Jasper County Circuit Court on 08/10/2021. (CS) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter to Billy G. Rayner, Circuit Clerk of Jasper County, MS, transmitting certified copies of Order to Remand and docket sheet. (LDR) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting Unopposed #5 Motion to Remand. This action is hereby remanded to the Circuit Court of the First Judicial District of Jasper County, Mississippi. Signed by District Judge Taylor B. McNeel on 8/5/2021. (LDR) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand by Ethel McDonald (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cerra, Eric) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Service of Request for Admissions by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan (Mansfield, Kenna) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan (Mansfield, Kenna) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan from Circuit Court of Jasper County, Mississippi, case number 21-cv-31-P2. (Filing fee $402 receipt number AMSSDC-4603129) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-all process, pleadings, and orders served on FIC, #3 Exhibit B-State Court Record, #4 Exhibit C-demand ltr from pl's counsel 03.01.21) (CS) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Foremost Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr.