This case was last updated from PACER on 05/05/2020 at 08:29:10 (UTC).

McDonald v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 McDonald filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lanny King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00048

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lanny King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roger Glenn McDonald

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donna S. Thornton-Green

Attorney at Law Office of Donna Thornton-Green

5120 Village Square Drive, Suite 105

Paducah, KY 42001

Defendant Attorney

Timothy D. Thompson

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville

717 W. Broadway

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 3/10/2020 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is ordered to file Plaintiff's complaint and issue summons. The United States Marshal is ordered to serve the summons with a copy of the complaint and this order on the Defendant(s). The United States shall advance the costs of service. cc: Counsel(MNM) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 4/2/2020. (MNM) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to USMS-Louisville for service as instructed. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Form) (MNM) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 3/10/2020 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is ordered to file Plaintiff's complaint and issue summons. The United States Marshal is ordered to serve the summons with a copy of the complaint and this order on the Defendant(s). The United States shall advance the costs of service. cc: Counsel(MNM) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lanny King. (MNM) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Roger Glenn McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (MNM) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Roger Glenn McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less