This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2022 at 08:37:29 (UTC).

McDonald et al v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 McDonald filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00003

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeffery L. McDonald

Kelly McDonald

Defendants

Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Lowe's Home Centers, Inc.

Lowe's Companies, Inc.

Lowe's Investment Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan R. Hamby

Attorney at LOONBY, LOONEY & CHADWELL, PLLC

156 Rector Avenue

Crossville, TN 38555

Russell W. Lewis, IV

Attorney at Johnson Law Group

1019 16Th Avenue South

Nashville, TN 37212

Defendant Attorney

Darrick Lee O'Dell

Attorney at Spicer Rudstrom, PLLC (Nashville Office)

414 Union Street, Suite 1700

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC from Cumberland Co. Circuit Court, case number CCI-22-CV-6841. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0650-3537602). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in State Court, #2 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint in State Court

1 #2

Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (ln) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 4/25/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/24/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(O'Dell, Darrick) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the initial case management conference is RESET for April 28, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. (Doc. No. #6 .) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/29/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the initial case management conference is RESET for April 28, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. (Doc. No. #6 .) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/29/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(O'Dell, Darrick) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/24/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 4/25/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL Jonathan R. Hamby: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 3/16/2022. (ln) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan R. Hamby not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Russell W. Lewis, IV admitted to this court. (ln) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Darrick Lee O'Dell admitted to this court. (ln) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (ln) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC from Cumberland Co. Circuit Court, case number CCI-22-CV-6841. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0650-3537602). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in State Court, #2 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less