This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/06/2020 at 08:19:03 (UTC).

McDonald County, Missouri v. Allergan PLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 McDonald County, Missouri filed an Other lawsuit against Allergan PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-OP-45225

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

Walmart Inc.

Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP formerly known as Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. doing business as Walmart #5261

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation

Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.

J M Smith Corporation

Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Mylan Institutional Inc.

Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.

Cardinal Health 110, LLC

Mallinckrodt LLC

Michael Babich

Mallinckrodt PLC

Cypress Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Cardinal Health 113, LLC

Cardinal Health 200, LLC

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Cardinal Health 108, LLC

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Lauren M. Wacker

Matthew A. Jacober

Peter William Bay

Randy J. Soriano

Other Attorneys

Michael R. Owens

John F. Edgar

 

Court Documents

30 #1

*Restricted*

#30

#29

#28

#27

18 #1

Exhibit 1

#18

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#11

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Original Filing Form

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/07/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern. Case number 4:20-cv-00620. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/07/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#29) ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 08/06/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) TRANSFER ORDER w/Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the Panel (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 08/05/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) ORDER STAYING CASE re: #11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant Specgx LLC. It is hereby ORDERED that: 1.The Moving Defendants' motion is Granted. 2. The Litigation is STAYED pending the JPML's final decision on whether this action will be transferred to the Opiate MDL. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 06/18/20. (CMH) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 06/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiff McDonald County, Missouri. (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 05/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 05/26/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 05/15/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) NOTICE Request for Judicial Notice: by Plaintiff McDonald County, Missouri (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 05/12/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Plaintiff McDonald County, Missouri. (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 05/12/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiff McDonald County, Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 05/12/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
05/07/2020

Docket(#9) Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Michael R. Owens. Review of case shows that Attorney Michael R. Owens is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (JWD) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 05/07/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2020

DocketCase Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (JWD) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 05/07/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(JWD) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 05/07/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri, filed by McDonald County, Missouri.(JWD) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 05/07/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren M. Wacker for Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, Walmart Inc.. (Wacker, Lauren) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 05/07/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew A. Jacober for Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, Walmart Inc.. (Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 05/07/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, Walmart Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 05/07/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP.. (Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 05/07/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Walmart Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: Wal-Mart de Mexico, S.A.B. de C.V.; Flipkart Private Limited; Massmart Holdings Ltd., Publicly held company: None,. (Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 05/07/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 2022-CC00522, with receipt number AMOEDC-7902210, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 05/07/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less