This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:37:41 (UTC).

McDermott v. Zola Levitt Ministries Inc

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 McDermott filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Zola Levitt Ministries Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam A Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00423

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam A Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew McDermott

Defendant

Zola Levitt Ministries Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Paul Liebowitz

Attorney at Liebowitz Law Firm PLLC

11 Sunrise Plaza, Suite 305

Valley Stream, NY 11580

Defendant Attorney

Greg H Parker

Attorney at Parker Justiss, P.C.

14241 Dallas Parkway, Suite 620

Dallas, TX 75254

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Matthew McDermott (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

9 #1

Proposed Order

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C

#4

(#4) Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (ndt) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Matthew McDermott. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

1 #4

Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Zola Levitt Ministries Inc. (ndt) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#9

(#9) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Zola Levitt Ministries Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Parker, Greg) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Greg H Parker on behalf of Zola Levitt Ministries Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Parker, Greg) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #5

Copyright Form

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Zola Levitt Ministries Inc filed by Matthew McDermott. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9791252) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant Zola Levitt Ministries, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is 4/30/2019. No further extensions of this deadline will be allowed. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/9/2019) (chmb) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Zola Levitt Ministries Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Parker, Greg) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Greg H Parker on behalf of Zola Levitt Ministries Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Parker, Greg) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant Zola Levitt Ministries, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is 4/9/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/22/2019) (chmb) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Matthew McDermott (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Zola Levitt Ministries Inc. (ndt) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (ndt) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Matthew McDermott. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Zola Levitt Ministries Inc filed by Matthew McDermott. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9791252) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.