This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2020 at 08:48:19 (UTC).

McDermott v. Salem Media Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 McDermott filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Salem Media Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark Pittman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00097

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew McDermott

Defendant

Salem Media Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Paul Liebowitz

Attorney at Liebowitz Law Firm PLLC

11 Sunrise Plaza, Suite 305

Valley Stream, NY 11580

Elizabeth Aten Lamberson

Attorney at The Coles Firm PC

6333 E. Mockingbird Ln, Suite 147-524

Dallas, TX 75214

Michael E Coles

Attorney at The Coles Firm PC

4925 Greenville Avenue, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75206

Defendant Attorney

Sean M Whyte

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC

100 Crescent Court, Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Additional Page(s)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Aten Lamberson for Michael E. Coles on behalf of Matthew McDermott. (Lamberson, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#10

(#10) FINAL JUDGMENT... This Judgment is issued pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58(a). The Court issued its order dismissing this case for failure to comply with a court order. See ECF No. 8. It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/11/2020) (wxc) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER... The Court ordered Plaintiff Matthew McDermott to comply with Local Rule 83.10 within fourteen days of the February 25, 2020 Order (ECF No. 8). A review of the record reveals that McDermott is still not in compliance with Local Rule 83.10(a). Because McDermott has failed to follow the Local Rules of the Northern District and has failed to follow a court order, the Court ORDERS that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedre. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/11/2020) (wxc) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER... A review of the record reveals that Plaintiff Matthew McDermott is not in compliance with Local Rule 83.10(a). Accordingly, within fourteen days of this order, Plaintiff shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in the imposition of sanctions and/or the dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/25/2020) (wxc) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 ... Before the Court is Defendants Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF No. 6). Having considered the unopposed motion the Court finds that it should be and is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendant is ORDERED to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before March 12, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/25/2020) (wxc) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Salem Media Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Sean M Whyte added to party Salem Media Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Whyte, Sean) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Salem Media Group, Inc.. (wxc) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (wxc) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/6/2020) (wxc). (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Matthew McDermott. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Salem Media Group, Inc. filed by Matthew McDermott. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10599279) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Report to Copyright Office of Final Order. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (wxc) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Aten Lamberson for Michael E. Coles on behalf of Matthew McDermott. (Lamberson, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FINAL JUDGMENT... This Judgment is issued pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58(a). The Court issued its order dismissing this case for failure to comply with a court order. See ECF No. 8. It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/11/2020) (wxc) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER... The Court ordered Plaintiff Matthew McDermott to comply with Local Rule 83.10 within fourteen days of the February 25, 2020 Order (ECF No. 8). A review of the record reveals that McDermott is still not in compliance with Local Rule 83.10(a). Because McDermott has failed to follow the Local Rules of the Northern District and has failed to follow a court order, the Court ORDERS that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedre. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/11/2020) (wxc) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER... A review of the record reveals that Plaintiff Matthew McDermott is not in compliance with Local Rule 83.10(a). Accordingly, within fourteen days of this order, Plaintiff shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in the imposition of sanctions and/or the dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/25/2020) (wxc) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 ... Before the Court is Defendants Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF No. 6). Having considered the unopposed motion the Court finds that it should be and is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendant is ORDERED to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before March 12, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/25/2020) (wxc) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Salem Media Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Sean M Whyte added to party Salem Media Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Whyte, Sean) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Salem Media Group, Inc.. (wxc) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (wxc) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/6/2020) (wxc). (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Matthew McDermott. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Salem Media Group, Inc. filed by Matthew McDermott. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10599279) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less