This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2020 at 11:09:20 (UTC).

MCDERMOTT et al v. MMG INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 MCDERMOTT filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against MMG INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03581

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL M. BAYLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAWN MCDERMOTT

JOHN MCDERMOTT

Defendant

MMG INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREDRIC S. KARPF

Attorney at HOFFMAN, STERNBERG & KARPF, LLC

737 Second Street Pike

Southampton, PA 18966-3963

Defendant Attorney

BROOKS FOLAND

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

100 Corporate Center Drive, Suite 201

Camp Hill, PA 07011

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT THE ABOVE ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL, WITHOUT COSTS, PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/5/20. 8/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by MMG INSURANCE COMPANY to Judge Baylson regarding settlement reached between the parties (FOLAND, BROOKS) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

3 #7

NOTICE OF REMOVAL

3 #6

AFFIDAVIT OF CERTIFICATE

3 #5

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

3 #4

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

3 #3

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

3 #2

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

3 #1

NOTICE

#3

(#3) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of MONTGOMERY County. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE, #2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, #5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #6 AFFIDAVIT OF CERTIFICATE, #7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(JL) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, SO THAT THEY CAN BE FILED IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/30/20. 7/30/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit A

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MMG INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14440355), from the Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County Case No. 2020-10759, filed by MMG INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(FOLAND, BROOKS) Modified on 7/22/2020 (md, ). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER THAT THE ABOVE ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL, WITHOUT COSTS, PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/5/20. 8/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by MMG INSURANCE COMPANY to Judge Baylson regarding settlement reached between the parties (FOLAND, BROOKS) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of MONTGOMERY County. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE, #2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, #5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #6 AFFIDAVIT OF CERTIFICATE, #7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(JL) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, SO THAT THEY CAN BE FILED IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/30/20. 7/30/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by MMG INSURANCE COMPANY. (md, ) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MMG INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14440355), from the Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County Case No. 2020-10759, filed by MMG INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(FOLAND, BROOKS) Modified on 7/22/2020 (md, ). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less