This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/30/2021 at 08:01:45 (UTC).

McDermott et al v. Elanco Animal Health, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 McDermott filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Elanco Animal Health, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Robert Blakey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04483

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael McDermott

Christina McDermott

Defendants

Elanco Animal Health, Inc.

Bayer Healthcare, LLC

Bayer Healthcare Animal Health, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William T. Dowd

Attorney at Dowd & Dowd, P.C.

211 N. Broadway, Suite 4050

Saint Louis, MO 63102

Alex R. Lumaghi

Attorney at Dowd & Dowd, PC

211 N Broadway, Ste 4050

Saint Louis, MO 63102

Defendant Attorneys

Kerensa Cassis

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP-KCMO

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

John P Mandler

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 S Seventh St

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp

300 N. Meridian St., Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Andrew Campbell

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp

300 N. Meridian St., Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Blake Anthony Angelino

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

311 S. Wacker Dr., #4300

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Alex Lumaghi's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #13 is granted. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18695804. (Lumaghi, Alex) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#12

(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare Animal Health, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by John P Mandler, P (Mandler, John) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare Animal Health, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Andrea Roberts Pierson (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare Animal Health, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Andrew Campbell (Campbell, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare Animal Health, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Blake Anthony Angelino (Angelino, Blake) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#8

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #5

Waiver of Service Bayer Healthcare Animal Health, Inc.

1 #3

Waiver of Service Elanco Animal Health, Inc.

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Alex Lumaghi's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #13 is granted. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18695804. (Lumaghi, Alex) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare Animal Health, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by John P Mandler, P (Mandler, John) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare Animal Health, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Andrea Roberts Pierson (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare Animal Health, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Andrew Campbell (Campbell, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare Animal Health, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Blake Anthony Angelino (Angelino, Blake) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAILED MDL transfer in letter to all Counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RECEIVED from Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00461 (nsf,) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER w/ Schedule A to: Northern District of Illinois. Case transferred via CM/ECF Transfer. (DJO) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TRANSFER ORDER w/Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the Panel (DLB) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #3 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Deadlines Pending Transfer by Defendant Elanco Animal Health, Inc.. (Cassis, Kerensa) filed by Elanco Animal Health, Inc. ; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on June 21, 2021. (MCB) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Deadlines Pending Transfer by Defendant Elanco Animal Health, Inc.. (Cassis, Kerensa) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Michael McDermott, Christina McDermott Bayer Healthcare Animal Health, Inc. waiver signed on 4/22/2021, answer due 6/21/2021; Bayer Healthcare, LLC waiver signed on 4/22/2021, answer due 6/21/2021; Elanco Animal Health, Inc. waiver signed on 4/22/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Dowd, William) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Waivers issued: 3. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (BAK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Bayer Healthcare Animal Health, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-8601550, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Michael McDermott, Christina McDermott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service Elanco Animal Health, Inc., #4 Waiver of Service Bayer Healthcare, LLC, #5 Waiver of Service Bayer Healthcare Animal Health, Inc.)(Dowd, William) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayer HealthCare LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Blake Anthony Angelino