This case was last updated from PACER on 08/12/2019 at 07:13:33 (UTC).

McDermet v. DIRECTV, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 McDermet filed an Other lawsuit against DIRECTV, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is F. Dennis Saylor, IV. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11322

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

F. Dennis Saylor, IV

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pro Se Party William McDermet

Ipswich, MA 01938

Defendants

Nick Jones

The DIRECTV Group, Inc.

David Christopher

DIRECTV, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William W. McDermet, IV

2 Second Street

Ipswich, MA 01938

Defendant Attorneys

Steven M. Cowley

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

100 High Street, Suite 2400

Boston, MA 02210-1724

Kyle J. Steinmetz

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

71 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Gina M. Puls

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

100 High Street, Suite 2400

Boston, MA 02110-1724

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Scheduling Order Template

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David Christopher, DIRECTV, LLC, Nick Jones, The DIRECTV Group, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7731340 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Form)(Cowley, Steven) (Attachment 6 replaced on 6/14/2019 due to missing counsel signature (Warnock, Douglas). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

1 #7

Category Form

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2019 03:10 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Order Template)(Bono, Christine) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

#13

(#13) Assented to MOTION to Amend #12 Amended Complaint, #9 State Court Record Complaint by William McDermet.(McDermet, William) (Entered: 07/14/2019)

#9

(#9) STATE COURT Record. (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint And Jury Demand by David Christopher, DIRECTV, LLC, Nick Jones, The DIRECTV Group, Inc..(Steinmetz, Kyle) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The DIRECTV Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent DIRECTV Group Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for The DIRECTV Group, Inc... (Cowley, Steven) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by David Christopher, DIRECTV, LLC, Nick Jones, The DIRECTV Group, Inc.. (Cowley, Steven) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William McDermet.(McDermet, William) (Entered: 07/14/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit E

#16

(#16) STIPULATION of Dismissal by DIRECTV, LLC, The DIRECTV Group, Inc.. (Steinmetz, Kyle) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DIRECTV, LLC identifying Corporate Parent DIRECTV Group Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent The DIRECTV Group Inc., Corporate Parent DIRECTV Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for DIRECTV, LLC.. (Cowley, Steven) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kyle J. Steinmetz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7738337 by David Christopher, DIRECTV, LLC, Nick Jones, The DIRECTV Group, Inc..(Cowley, Steven) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2019 03:10 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Order Template)(Bono, Christine) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION of Dismissal by DIRECTV, LLC, The DIRECTV Group, Inc.. (Steinmetz, Kyle) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint And Jury Demand by David Christopher, DIRECTV, LLC, Nick Jones, The DIRECTV Group, Inc..(Steinmetz, Kyle) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion to Amend (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Assented to MOTION to Amend #12 Amended Complaint, #9 State Court Record Complaint by William McDermet.(McDermet, William) (Entered: 07/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William McDermet.(McDermet, William) (Entered: 07/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • (#11) Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants - Response to Complaint due by 7/23/2019. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Treating the #8 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint as a motion, the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint by July 23, 2019. Court will reset the deadline. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STATE COURT Record. (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by David Christopher, DIRECTV, LLC, Nick Jones, The DIRECTV Group, Inc.. (Cowley, Steven) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kyle J. Steinmetz, Esq.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kyle J. Steinmetz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7738337 by David Christopher, DIRECTV, LLC, Nick Jones, The DIRECTV Group, Inc..(Cowley, Steven) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#5) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (adminn, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DIRECTV, LLC identifying Corporate Parent DIRECTV Group Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent The DIRECTV Group Inc., Corporate Parent DIRECTV Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for DIRECTV, LLC.. (Cowley, Steven) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The DIRECTV Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent DIRECTV Group Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for The DIRECTV Group, Inc... (Cowley, Steven) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David Christopher, DIRECTV, LLC, Nick Jones, The DIRECTV Group, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7731340 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Form)(Cowley, Steven) (Attachment 6 replaced on 6/14/2019 due to missing counsel signature (Warnock, Douglas). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.