This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/21/2021 at 21:07:40 (UTC).

McDaniel-Yates v. Wal-Mart Inc et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 McDaniel-Yates filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joe Heaton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00133

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joe Heaton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Britany McDaniel-Yates

Defendants

Wal-Mart Inc

Wal-Mart Stores East LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael D Denton, Jr

Attorney at Denton Law Firm PC

925 West State Highway 152

Mustang, OK 73064

Austin C Walters

Attorney at Denton Law Firm PC

925 West State Highway 152

Mustang, OK 73064

Defendant Attorneys

Michael W Brewer

Attorney at Hiltgen & Brewer

9505 N Kelley

Oklahoma City, OK 73131

Jeffrey D Scott

Attorney at Hiltgen & Brewer

9505 N Kelley

Oklahoma City, OK 73131

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#9

8 #1

Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - FS EOA - JDS

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - FS EOA - MWB

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - OSCN Case Details

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions in limine due 11/15/2021; Jury instructions due 11/15/2021; Voir dire requests due 11/15/2021; Trial briefs due 11/15/2021; Discovery due by 9/1/2021. Jury Trial set on the court's 12/2021 trial docket in Courtroom 501 before Honorable Joe Heaton. Motions due by 9/15/2021. Pretrial Report due by 11/15/2021.. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 04/05/2021. (lam) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER striking the 04/07/2021 civil scheduling conference...see separate scheduling order for specific deadlines and trial date. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 04/05/2021. (lam) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Britany McDaniel-Yates. (Walters, Austin) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 04/07/2021 @ 10:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Joe Heaton. Joint Status Report and Joint Discovery Plan due by 03/29/2021. (lam) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court)(Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Scott on behalf of All Defendants (Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael D Denton, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Denton, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael D Denton, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Denton, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Defendants . (Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Defendants. (Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of All Defendants (Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3601910. (Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Canadian County District Court, case number CJ-2021-24 filed by Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN Case Details, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - FS Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Petition, #5 Exhibit 5 - FS EOA - MWB, #6 Exhibit 6 - FS EOA - JDS, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael D. Denton, Jr.