This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2021 at 06:35:32 (UTC).

(PS) McDaniel v. United States et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 PS McDaniel filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William B. Shubb and Deborah Barnes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01696

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William B. Shubb

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tanya Grace McDaniel

Davis, CA 95617

Defendants

United States

California

San Francisco, CA

Sacramento, CA

Davis, CA

Yolo County

Rita F. Durgin

Curry

Kamala Harris

Gavin Newsom

Judge Dan Wolk

DOJ

Rivas

NFL

Lester Hayes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Wendy Marie Garbers

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Sara Winslow

Attorney at United States Attorney

Po Box 36055, 450 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

Meredith Blagden Osborn, NACED

Attorney at City Attorney's Office

1390 Market Street, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

Danielle J. Williams

Attorney at Angelo, Kilday, Kilduff

601 University Ave.

Sacramento, CA 95825

Kinga L. Wright

Attorney at Office of Legislative Counsel

925 L Street, Suite 900

Sacramento, CA 95814

Frank M. La Fleur

Attorney at California Department of Justice

455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Jason David Russell, NACED

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3144

 

Court Documents

56 #1

Consent Form

56 #56

Main Document

55 #1

*Restricted*

55 #55

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#54

(#54) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS #37 MOTION TO TRANSFER. Case transferred to Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/16/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/17/2021)

53 #2

Envelope

53 #53

Main Document

37 #1

Proposed Order

37 #37

Main Document

6 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. The Clerk will now reassign this case to a United States District Judge because one or more of the parties has requested reassignment to a United States District Judge or has not consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge. All hearing dates currently scheduled before ALEX G. TSE are vacated and should be re-noticed for hearing before the District Judge to whom this case is reassigned. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#4

(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tanya Grace McDaniel. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#2

(#7) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 03/01/2021)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • Docket(#58) CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Meredith Blagden Osborn, NACED: Attorney Meredith Blagden Osborn is DIRECTED to register for admission to the Eastern District of California. Please visit PACER.gov for admission. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docket(#57) CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Jason David Russell, NACED: Attorney Jason David Russell is DIRECTED to register for admission to the Eastern District of California. Please visit PACER.gov for admission. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #56 Civil New Case Documents for WBS served on Tanya Grace McDaniel. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00994. (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS #37 MOTION TO TRANSFER. Case transferred to Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/16/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Rita Durgin's Motion to Dismiss and Reinstate MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Tanya Grace McDaniel. Responses due by 9/22/2021. Replies due by 9/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) REPLY (re #43 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byYolo County. (Williams, Danielle) (Filed on 9/3/2021) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) REPLY (re #42 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byDavis, CA. (Williams, Danielle) (Filed on 9/3/2021) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) REPLY (re #46 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byCurry, Rita F. Durgin, Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Wright, Kinga) (Filed on 9/2/2021) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/9/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of #8 mailed to plaintiff 3/2/2021 (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST For Address Information for Summons re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 2/26/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. The Clerk will now reassign this case to a United States District Judge because one or more of the parties has requested reassignment to a United States District Judge or has not consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge. All hearing dates currently scheduled before ALEX G. TSE are vacated and should be re-noticed for hearing before the District Judge to whom this case is reassigned. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tanya Grace McDaniel. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tanya Grace McDaniel. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against California, Curry, DOJ, Davis, CA, Rita F. Durgin, Shiavone V Fortune, Kamala Harris, Lester Hayes, NFL, Gavin Newsom, Rivas, Sacramento, CA, San Francisco, CA, United States, Dan Wolk, Yolo County. Filed byTanya Grace McDaniel. Consent/Declination due by 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021) [Transferred from cand on 9/17/2021.] (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NFL is a litigant

Latest cases where Curry is a litigant

Latest cases where Yolo County is a litigant

Latest cases where RIVAS is a litigant