This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/10/2022 at 09:52:35 (UTC).

Denise L. McDaniel v. Ford Motor Company

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 Denise L McDaniel filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Percy Anderson and Alka Sagar. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02431

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Denise McDaniel

Denise L. McDaniel

Defendants

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron Cohen

Attorney at Quill and Arrow LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Kevin Y Jacobson

Attorney at Quill and Arrow LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel F Kashani

Attorney at Gates Gonter Guy Proudfoot and Muench LLP

38 Discovery Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

Matthew M Proudfoot

Attorney at Gates Conter Guy Proudfoot and Muench LLP

38 Discovery Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons & Complaint - State Court

1 #2

Answer to Complaint - State Court

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (iv) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. (iv) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rachel F Kashani on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attorney Rachel F Kashani added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Kashani, Rachel) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#13

(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin Y Jacobson counsel for Plaintiff Denise L. McDaniel. Adding Aaron Cohen as counsel of record for Denise L. McDaniel for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Denise L. McDaniel. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#14

(#14) MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Percy Anderson. Plaintiff's counsel moved for the Court to remand the action to Los Angeles Superior Court based on Defendant's failure to timely file the Notice of Removal. The Court grants Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Accordingly, this action is hereby remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case Number 21STCV45851 as a result of the procedural defect. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Laura Elias (video). (aco) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#15

(#15) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court for the State of California. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court for the State of California. (aco) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#16

(#16) Receipt of LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL - REMAND TO SUPERIOR COURT. (aco) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Receipt of LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL - REMAND TO SUPERIOR COURT. (aco) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court for the State of California. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court for the State of California. (aco) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Percy Anderson. Plaintiff's counsel moved for the Court to remand the action to Los Angeles Superior Court based on Defendant's failure to timely file the Notice of Removal. The Court grants Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Accordingly, this action is hereby remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case Number 21STCV45851 as a result of the procedural defect. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Laura Elias (video). (aco) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin Y Jacobson counsel for Plaintiff Denise L. McDaniel. Adding Aaron Cohen as counsel of record for Denise L. McDaniel for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Denise L. McDaniel. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rachel F Kashani on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attorney Rachel F Kashani added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Kashani, Rachel) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Percy Anderson Status Conference is set for 4/21/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. (iv) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (iv) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company on 1/19/2022, attached as Exhibit 2.(jtil) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Denise L. McDaniel in Los Angeles Superior Court on 12/16/2021, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV45851 Receipt No: ACACDC-33108913 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Y. Jacobson