This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/08/2022 at 09:17:16 (UTC).

McDaniel v. Blackboard Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 McDaniel filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Blackboard Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00740

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

individually Carolyn McDaniel

Carolyn McDaniel

Defendant

Blackboard Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kyle Patrick Malone

Attorney at Daly Black PC

2211 Norfolk Street, Ste 800

Houston, TX 77098

Richard D Daly

Attorney at Daly Black PC

2211 Norfolk St, Suite 800

Houston, TX 77098

Taylor Elliot Thompson

Attorney at Daly Black, PC

2211 Norfolk St., Ste. 800

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorney

Raymond L Gregory, II

Attorney at Eggleston Briscoe LLP

4800 Three Allen Center, 333 Clay Street

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit Tab 1 - Index of Matter

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Tab 2 - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Tab 3 - Pleadings on File

1 #5

Exhibit Tab 4 - Executed Process

1 #6

Exhibit Tab 6 - Docket Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit Tab 7 - List of Counsel

#2

(#2) AMENDED ANSWER to by Blackboard Insurance Company, filed. (Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Blackboard Insurance Company, filed.(Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor E. Thompson on behalf of Carolyn McDaniel, filed. (Thompson, Taylor) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Carolyn McDaniel, filed.(Thompson, Taylor) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Carolyn McDaniel, filed.(Thompson, Taylor) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Supplement

#8

(#8) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for First-Party Insurance Property Damage Cases Arising from Disasters.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for First-Party Insurance Property Damage Cases Arising from Disasters.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 5/24/2022 at 02:00 PM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. A Zoom link will be provided. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Carolyn McDaniel, filed.(Thompson, Taylor) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Carolyn McDaniel, filed.(Thompson, Taylor) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor E. Thompson on behalf of Carolyn McDaniel, filed. (Thompson, Taylor) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Blackboard Insurance Company, filed.(Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED ANSWER to by Blackboard Insurance Company, filed. (Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 400th District Court of Fort Bend County, Texas, case number 22-DCV-290280 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-27856035) filed by Blackboard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Tab 1 - Index of Matter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Tab 2 - Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Tab 3 - Pleadings on File, #5 Exhibit Tab 4 - Executed Process, #6 Exhibit Tab 6 - Docket Sheet, #7 Exhibit Tab 7 - List of Counsel)(Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard D Daly