This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/27/2020 at 07:39:23 (UTC).

McDaniel et al v. Apex Systems, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 McDaniel filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Apex Systems, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan van Keulen and Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-06073

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Susan van Keulen

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jay Perry

Ivey McDaniel

Defendant

Apex Systems, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Douglas Han

Attorney at Justice Law Corporation

751 N. Fair Oaks Avenue, Suite 101

Pasadena, CA 91103

Areen Babajanian

Attorney at Justice Law Corporation

751 N. Fair Oaks Avenue, Suite 101

Pasadena, CA 91103

Brian G. Lee

Attorney at Yoon Law, APC

624 S. Grand Avenue Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Shunt Tatavos-Gharajeh

Attorney at Justice Law Corporation

751 N. Fair Oaks Avenue, Suite 101

Pasadena, CA 91103

Kenneth H. Yoon

Attorney at Law Offices of Kenneth H. Yoon

One Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3383

Stephanie Emi Yasuda

Attorney at Law Offices of Kenneth H. Yoon

624 S. Grand Ave., Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorney

Wendy Amoreena Sugg

Attorney at Sugg & Paracuellos, LLP

384 Forest Ave., Suite 15

Laguna Beach, CA 92651

 

Court Documents

#13

#5

#1

#22

#21

#19

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

12 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#12

#9

#8

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPLY (re #18 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byApex Systems, LLC. (Sugg, Wendy) (Filed on 10/26/2020) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Dismiss ) Plaintiffs Ivey McDaniel and Jay Perry's Opposition to Defendant Apex Systems, LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed byIvey McDaniel, Jay Perry. (Yasuda, Stephanie) (Filed on 10/19/2020) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. The Motion hearing set previously set for 11/18/2020 is CONTINUED. due to being set on a date that is closed to further setttings.Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (Related documents(s) #18 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Certificate of Interested Entities by Apex Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ASGN Inc. for Apex Systems, LLC. (Sugg, Wendy) (Filed on 10/5/2020) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Apex Systems, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/19/2020. Replies due by 10/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sugg, Wendy) (Filed on 10/5/2020) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:20-cv-06073-JST. Re:[1 7] Certificate of Service filed by Ivey McDaniel (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ivey McDaniel (Han, Douglas) (Filed on 9/25/2020) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Emi Yasuda (Yasuda, Stephanie) (Filed on 9/15/2020) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian G. Lee (Lee, Brian) (Filed on 9/15/2020) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth H. Yoon (Yoon, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/15/2020) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ivey McDaniel, Jay Perry.. (Tatavos-Gharajeh, Shunt) (Filed on 9/11/2020) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Areen Babajanian (Babajanian, Areen) (Filed on 9/10/2020) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Shunt Tatavos-Gharajeh (Tatavos-Gharajeh, Shunt) (Filed on 9/10/2020) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Apex Systems, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 11/24/20 20. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/11/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Ivey McDaniel, Jay Perry (Han, Douglas) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Han, Douglas) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14875808.). Filed byIvey McDaniel, Jay Perry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Han, Douglas) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less