This case was last updated from PACER on 01/23/2021 at 12:21:09 (UTC).

McCurty v. Bama Concrete Products Company Inc

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 McCurty filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Bama Concrete Products Company Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John H England, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01869

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John H England, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald McCurty

Defendants

Bama Concrete Products Company Inc

Bama Concrete Birmingham Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Collin Sheffer

Attorney at WIGGINS, CHILDS, PANTAZIS, FISHER & GOLDFARB, LLC

301 19Th Street West

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

R Brett Adair

Attorney at CARR ALLISON

100 Vestavia Parkway

Birmingham, AL 25216

Michael C Guarino

Attorney at CARR ALLISON

100 Vestavia Pkwy

Birmingham, AL 35216

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Bama Concrete Products Company Inc, filed by Donald McCurty.(Sheffer, Eric) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

10 #1

Exhibit 1

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Donald McCurty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sheffer, Eric) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 01/13/2021. (AKD) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than March 1, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after March 1, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for February 12, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 01/13/2021. (AKD) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C Guarino on behalf of Bama Concrete Products Company Inc (Guarino, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bama Concrete Products Company Inc.(Adair, R) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee by Donald McCurty as to defendant Bama Concrete Products Company Inc. (AKD) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Bama Concrete Products Company Inc. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Donald McCurty. (Sheffer, Eric) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bama Concrete Products Company Inc, filed by Donald McCurty.(AKD) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Bama Concrete Products Company Inc, filed by Donald McCurty.(Sheffer, Eric) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file his amended complaint as soon as practicable. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 1/15/2021. (CDG) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Donald McCurty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sheffer, Eric) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 01/13/2021. (AKD) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than March 1, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after March 1, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for February 12, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 01/13/2021. (AKD) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C Guarino on behalf of Bama Concrete Products Company Inc (Guarino, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bama Concrete Products Company Inc.(Adair, R) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee by Donald McCurty as to defendant Bama Concrete Products Company Inc. (AKD) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Bama Concrete Products Company Inc. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Donald McCurty. (Sheffer, Eric) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3724262 (B4601109887). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Bama Concrete Products Company Inc, filed by Donald McCurty.(AKD). (Sheffer, Eric) Modified on 11/30/2020 (MEB2). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bama Concrete Products Company Inc, filed by Donald McCurty.(AKD) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Collin Sheffer