This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/06/2022 at 07:55:29 (UTC).

McCune v. JD Towing LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 McCune filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against JD Towing LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eileen S Willett and Susan M Brnovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00354

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Eileen S Willett

Susan M Brnovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sean McCune

Defendants

JD Towing LLC

Jorge Duenas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Michelle Kuklinski

Attorney at Zoldan Law Group PLLC

5050 N 40Th St., Ste. 260

Phoenix, AZ 85018

Jason Saul Barrat

Attorney at Zoldan Law Group PLLC

5050 N 40Th St., Ste. 260

Phoenix, AZ 85018

Defendant Attorney

Anjali J Patel

Attorney at Tyler Allen Law Firm PLLC

4201 N 24Th St., Ste. 200

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20419062. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S. Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-354-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (JAM) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Summons

#8

(#8) ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/08/2022. (ESG) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/08/2022. (ESG) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on June 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/8/2022. (ESG) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#11

(#11) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sean McCune: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CONSENT TO EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ELECTION TO ASSIGN CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND MINUTE ENTRY ORDER RE: SAME; ORDER RE: SECTION D OF THE ECF ADMINISTRATIVE POLICIES & PROCEDURES; ORDER RE: MOTIONS; ORDER RE: SERVICE upon JD Towing LLC on 22.03.14. (Kuklinski, Amanda) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#12

(#12) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sean McCune: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CONSENT TO EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ELECTION TO ASSIGN CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND MINUTE ENTRY ORDER RE: SAME; ORDER RE: SECTION D OF THE ECF ADMINISTRATIVE POLICIES & PROCEDURES; ORDER RE: MOTIONS; ORDER RE: SERVICE upon Jorge Duenas on 22.03.14. (Kuklinski, Amanda) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#13

(#13) First Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Jorge Duenas, JD Towing LLC. (Patel, Anjali) *Incorrect event selected. Docket text modified on 4/11/2022 (ESG). (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER pursuant to the #13 Stipulation for Extension of Time, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Answer deadline is extended to April 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/11/2022. (ESG) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#15

(#15) First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jorge Duenas. (Patel, Anjali) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re: #15 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sean McCune. (Kuklinski, Amanda) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jorge Duenas. (Patel, Anjali) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER pursuant to the #13 Stipulation for Extension of Time, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Answer deadline is extended to April 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/11/2022. (ESG) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) First Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Jorge Duenas, JD Towing LLC. (Patel, Anjali) *Incorrect event selected. Docket text modified on 4/11/2022 (ESG). (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sean McCune: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CONSENT TO EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ELECTION TO ASSIGN CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND MINUTE ENTRY ORDER RE: SAME; ORDER RE: SECTION D OF THE ECF ADMINISTRATIVE POLICIES & PROCEDURES; ORDER RE: MOTIONS; ORDER RE: SERVICE upon Jorge Duenas on 22.03.14. (Kuklinski, Amanda) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sean McCune: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CONSENT TO EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ELECTION TO ASSIGN CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND MINUTE ENTRY ORDER RE: SAME; ORDER RE: SECTION D OF THE ECF ADMINISTRATIVE POLICIES & PROCEDURES; ORDER RE: MOTIONS; ORDER RE: SERVICE upon JD Towing LLC on 22.03.14. (Kuklinski, Amanda) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on June 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/8/2022. (ESG) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/08/2022. (ESG) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/08/2022. (ESG) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-22-354-PHX-SMB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Docket(#6) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Jorge Duenas, JD Towing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20419062. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S. Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-354-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (JAM) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Sean McCune. (Kuklinski, Amanda) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JAM) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20419062 filed by Sean McCune. (Kuklinski, Amanda) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less