This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2021 at 10:57:59 (UTC).

McCune et al v. Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 McCune filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01341

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wayne Jordan

Allen McCune

Defendants

Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC

Justin Johnson

Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vuk Stevan Vujasinovic

Attorney at VB Attorneys

6363 Woodway, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77057

Curtis James Bickers

Attorney at Vujasinovic & Beckcom, PLLC

6363 Woodway, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant Attorney

Kent M Adams

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP

909 Fannin, Suite 3300

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn N Hughes. CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM held on 5/27/2021. The Court will enter and order. Appearances: Kent M Adams, Curtis James Bickers.(Court Reporter: Malone), filed.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER to Report. By 8/20/2021, the parties must jointly report the status of the case and the next steps to advance the litigation. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER on Remand. #5 (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Allen McCune, filed.(Bickers, Curtis) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Additional EXHIBITS re: #8 Response in Opposition to Motion by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc, Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC, filed.(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Opposed REPLY in Support of #5 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by Allen McCune. (Bickers, Curtis) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc, Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC. (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order: Initial Conference set for 5/27/2021 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Opposed PROPOSED ORDER re: #5 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed.(Bickers, Curtis) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Opposed MOTION to Remand by Allen McCune, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Bickers, Curtis) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc, Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC, filed.(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc, Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC, filed.(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(DesireeSillasadi, 4) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 125th Harris County, Texas, case number 2020-51436 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26325517) filed by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc, Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., a Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vuk Stevan Vujasinovic