This case was last updated from PACER on 08/01/2020 at 11:05:46 (UTC).

McCune et al v. Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 McCune filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01927

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wayne Jordan

Allen McCune

Defendants

Justin Johnson

Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vuk Stevan Vujasinovic

Attorney at Vujasinovic and Beckcom LLP

6363 Woodway, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77057

Brian Augustus Beckcom

Attorney at Vujasinovic Beckcom

6363 Woodway, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant Attorney

Kent M Adams

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP

909 Fannin, Suite 3300

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER re: #9 Notice of Dismissal. Case terminated on 07/14/2020.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Dismissal as to Allen McCune by Allen McCune, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beckcom, Brian) (Entered: 07/12/2020)

5 #20

Exhibit Exhibit 20

5 #19

Exhibit Exhibit 19

5 #18

Exhibit Exhibit 18

5 #17

Exhibit Exhibit 17

5 #16

Exhibit Exhibit 16

5 #15

Exhibit Exhibit 15

5 #14

Exhibit Exhibit 14

5 #13

Exhibit Exhibit 13

5 #12

Exhibit Exhibit 12

5 #11

Exhibit Exhibit 11

5 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

5 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

5 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

5 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#5

(#5) MOTION to Remand by Wayne Jordan, Allen McCune, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand)(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER re: #9 Notice of Dismissal. Case terminated on 07/14/2020.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Dismissal as to Allen McCune by Allen McCune, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beckcom, Brian) (Entered: 07/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC. (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC, filed.(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand by Wayne Jordan, Allen McCune, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand)(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Deadline to respond to the operative pleadings is extended through 06/22/2020. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd Judicial District Court, Harris County Texas, case number 2020-30440 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24740012) filed by Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kent M. Adams