This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/30/2021 at 10:14:51 (UTC).

McCullough v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 McCullough filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J Trenga and John F. Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00256

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony J Trenga

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marie McCullough

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Ryan McCarley

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Arati C. Furness

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Amy Lorrelle Stone

Attorney at The Moody Law Firm

500 Crawford Street, Suite 200

Portsmouth, VA 23704

Kelly Chermack

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC (TX-NA)

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC

201 17Th St. Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Philip M. Busman

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP (DC)

101 Constitution Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

David Michael Barnes

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP (DC)

101 Constitution Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#19

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

#17

#16

15 #2

Pretrial Notice

15 #1

Magistrate Consent

#15

14 #1

Magistrate Consent

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

#4

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #18 Joint Motion to Stay. This case and all actions in it are hereby STAYED through ninety (90) days after entry of this order to allow the parties to finalize settlement of this case. Upon expiration of the stay, the parties SHALL NOTIFY the Court of the status of this matter either by filing the appropriate closing documents or by filing a status report. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 4/13/21. (klau, ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Joint MOTION to Stay by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Busman, Philip) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Kelly Chermack for Marie McCullough. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 4/1/2021. (clar, ) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly Chermack and Certification of Local Counsel Amy L. Stone Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7696642. by Marie McCullough. (Stone, Amy) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 4/21/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 7/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 6/24/2021. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 3/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 5/21/2021. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 3/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STATUS REPORT [JOINT] by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case Management Order, Caldera v. C. R. Bard, Inc., Civ. A. No. CV19-4266 PHX DGC, Doc. 8 (D. Ariz. Jan. 10, 2020))(Busman, Philip) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Lorrelle Stone on behalf of Marie McCullough (Stone, Amy) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Richard B. North, Jr. of the law firm of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP is hereby permitted to withdraw as counsel for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 3/9/21. (klau, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Barnes on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Barnes, David) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Busman, Philip) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Busman, Philip) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip M. Busman on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Busman, Philip) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER that counsel shall file within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order a status report, jointly if possible, if not separately, concerning the issues already decided by the previous court and those issues remaining to be decided in this Court, including specifically, but without limitation, the status of discovery, any outstanding or anticipated motions, and whether the parties are ready for trial. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/2/21. (klau, ) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-03602. Original file and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Virginia via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.] (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.] (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/19/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-03602-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.] (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16141378 filed by Marie McCullough. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.] (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly Chermack

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arati Furness