This case was last updated from PACER on 09/01/2019 at 07:49:19 (UTC).

McCullough v. Bank of America Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 McCullough filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Bank of America Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT and WES REBER PORTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00350

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT

Referral Judge

WES REBER PORTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Derrol E. Estrella

Larry W. McCullough

Juanita F. Estrella

Defendants

Doe Defendants 1-50

Quicken Loans, Inc.

Damion C. Clark

Gentry L. Clark

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.

American Savings Bank, F.S.B.

James Sor

Bank of America Bank, N.A.

Bank of America, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton

Attorney at Bickerton Law Group LLLP

745 Fort St Ste 801

Honolulu, HI 96813

John F. Perkin

Attorney at Perkin & Faria

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1000, 523-2300, Fax: 697-5304

Honolulu, HI 96813

James J. Bickerton

Attorney at Bickerton Law Group LLLP

745 Fort St Ste 801, 599-3811

Honolulu, HI 96813

Van-Alan H. Shima

Attorney at Affinity Law Group

1188 Bishop St. Ste 3408, 545-4600, Fax: 5454601

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant Attorneys

Patricia J. McHenry

Attorney at Cades Schutte LLP

Cades Schutte Building, 1000 Bishop Street 12Th Flr, 521-9200

Honolulu, HI 96813

Allison Mizuo Lee

Attorney at Cades Schutte

1000 Bishop St 12Th Flr, 521-9200

Honolulu, HI 96813-4216

Robert A. Muckenfuss

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

201 N Tryon St Suite 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

James Blaine Rogers, III

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1001 Bishop Street 18Th Floor

Honolulu, HI 96813

Elizabeth M.Z. Timmermans

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

434 Fayetteville St Ste 2600

Raleigh, NC 27601

Madisson Leigh Heinze

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1001 Bishop St., Suite 1800

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) EP: EARLY GLOBAL SETTLEMENT held. The Court met with the parties. Settlement discussions held.No settlement reached at this time.Parties may contact Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield's courtroom Manager, Bernie Aurio at (808) 541-1298, if they so wish further assistance in settlement with the Court. (KJM Chambers 9:00 - 10:45.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#26

(#26) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ELIZABETH M.Z. TIMMERMANS re: #23 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/15/2019. ELIZABETH M.Z. TIMMERMANS, ESQ. (Law Firm: McGuireWoods LLP) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Defendants BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. and MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. (jo) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#25

(#25) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ROBERT A. MUCKENFUSS re: #22 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/15/2019. ROBERT A. MUCKENFUSS, ESQ. (Law Firm: McGuireWoods LLP) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Defendants BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. and MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. (jo) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

23 #2

Exhibit A

23 #1

Declaration of Elizabeth M.Z. Timmermans

#23

(#23) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth M.Z. Timmermans Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2246560.Patricia J. McHenry appearing for Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth M.Z. Timmermans, #2 Exhibit A)(McHenry, Patricia) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

22 #2

Exhibit A

22 #1

Declaration of Robert A. Muckenfuss

#22

(#22) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Robert A. Muckenfuss Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2246557.Patricia J. McHenry appearing for Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Muckenfuss, #2 Exhibit A)(McHenry, Patricia) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Certificate of Service

1 #6

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Declaration Patricia J. McHenry

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America Bank, N.A. from Third Circuit Court, case number 19-1-0105K. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2227168), filed by Bank of America Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Patricia J. McHenry, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(McHenry, Patricia) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) EP: EARLY GLOBAL SETTLEMENT held. The Court met with the parties. Settlement discussions held.No settlement reached at this time.Parties may contact Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield's courtroom Manager, Bernie Aurio at (808) 541-1298, if they so wish further assistance in settlement with the Court. (KJM Chambers 9:00 - 10:45.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ELIZABETH M.Z. TIMMERMANS re: #23 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/15/2019. ELIZABETH M.Z. TIMMERMANS, ESQ. (Law Firm: McGuireWoods LLP) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Defendants BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. and MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. (jo) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ROBERT A. MUCKENFUSS re: #22 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/15/2019. ROBERT A. MUCKENFUSS, ESQ. (Law Firm: McGuireWoods LLP) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Defendants BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. and MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. (jo) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • (#24) EO: This order is issued in the following four cases:Kumuhone v. Bank of America, Civ. No. 19-00348 JMS-KJM Benge v. Bank of America, Civ. No. 19-00349 JMS-KJM McCullough v. Bank of America, Civ. No. 19-00350 JMS-WRP Mattison v. Bank of America, Civ. No. 19-00354 JMS-WRPAt request of Defendants Bank of America and MERS, the hearing on the motions to remand is continued from October 28, 2019 to November 4, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Oppositions must be filed by October 7, 2019. Optional Replies must be filed by October 21, 2019.Although the cases are not consolidated, Defendants Bank of America and MERS and Plaintiffs may file identical joint Opposition and Reply Memoranda. The court allows each side an additional five pages (or equivalent word count) if necessary to allow the parties to address any issues that are unique to a particular case. Joint memoranda will be filed in each case, and should have a common caption reflecting the four cases. The court only requires one set of two courtesy copies.Any other Defendant not named in all four cases need only file a response in their particular case. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth M.Z. Timmermans Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2246560.Patricia J. McHenry appearing for Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth M.Z. Timmermans, #2 Exhibit A)(McHenry, Patricia) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Robert A. Muckenfuss Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2246557.Patricia J. McHenry appearing for Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Muckenfuss, #2 Exhibit A)(McHenry, Patricia) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) RESPONSE Letter to Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright from Patricia J. McHenry, Esq. filed by Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.. (McHenry, Patricia) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Errata re #19 Notice (Other), Defendant Bank of America, N.A.s Notice of Removal Directed at First Amended Complaint, Filed August 8, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H, #2 Certificate of Service)(McHenry, Patricia) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE by Bank of America, N.A. of Removal Directed at First Amended Complaint Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patricia J. McHenry, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Certificate of Service)(McHenry, Patricia) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • (#18) At parties request, an Early Global Settlement Conference is set for 08/21/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference Statements are due by 08/14/2019 and shall be emailed to mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.govRelated cases: Akana, Case No. 19-342 JAO-WRP;Apilado, Case No. 19-285 JAO-KJM; Benge, Case No. 19-349 JMS-KJM;Boyd, Case No. 19-353 LEK-KJM;Camat, Case No. 19-340 JAO-WRP;Ege, Case No. 19-351 LEK-KJM;Kumuhone, Case No. 19-348 JMS-KJM;Llanes, Case No. 19-356 DKW-WRP;Mattison, Case No. 19-354 JMS-WRP;McCullough, Case No. 19-350 JMS-WRP;DeGamo, Case No. 13-141 JAO-KJM. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A. (Re: First Amended Complaint)(jo) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons (Proposed) (Bickerton, James) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A. (jo) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons (Proposed) (Bickerton, James) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • (#6) EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 08/05/2019 is CONTINUED to 8/19/2019 at 09:30AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall notify Defendants of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/5/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00350 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America Bank, N.A.. (McHenry, Patricia) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Bank of America Bank, N.A. of Related Case Bank of America Bank, N.A.. (McHenry, Patricia) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America Bank, N.A. from Third Circuit Court, case number 19-1-0105K. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2227168), filed by Bank of America Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Patricia J. McHenry, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(McHenry, Patricia) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less