This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2021 at 10:14:13 (UTC).

McCray v. Williams et al (INMATE 3)

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 McCray filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Williams INMATE 3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerusha T. Adams and W. Harold Albritton, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00188

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerusha T. Adams

Presiding Judge

W. Harold Albritton, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Derril McCray

Alex City, AL 35010-0160

Defendants

Karen Williams

Steven T. Marshall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Bart Gregory Harmon

Attorney at Alabama Department of Corrections

301 South Ripley Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

Kristi Oggs Wilkerson

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

P O Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130-0152

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Emergency Hearing by James Derril McCray. (cwl, ) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time; the deadline for Respondents to file their answer is extended to 5/12/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/29/2021. (amf, ) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Second MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Answer by Karen Williams, Steven T. Marshall. (Harmon, Bart) Modified on 4/29/2021 to add as also filed on behalf of Defendant Marshall (amf, ). (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time; the deadline for Respondents to file their answer is extended to 4/28/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 3/29/2021. (amf, ) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Order by Steven T. Marshall, Karen Williams. (Harmon, Bart) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #10 ORDER - Attorney Kristi Oggs Wilkerson terminated. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER ON MOTION: It is ORDERED that Assistant Attorney General Kristi O. Wilkerson's #9 motion to withdraw as counsel of record for Respondents is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 3/26/2021. (amf, ) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Kristi O. Wilkerson to Withdraw as Counsel by Steven T. Marshall, Karen Williams. (Wilkerson, Kristi) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steven T. Marshall, Karen Williams. (Harmon, Bart) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Bart Gregory Harmon on behalf of Steven T. Marshall, Karen Williams (Harmon, Bart) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition & #2 Order, signed by Cathy Calloway for Karen Williams, served on 3/15/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (amf, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Defendants Steven T. Marshall & Karen Williams. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition & #2 Order, signed by J. Taylor for Steven T. Marshall, served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (amf, ) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steven T. Marshall, Karen Williams. (Wilkerson, Kristi) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Oggs Wilkerson on behalf of Steven T. Marshall, Karen Williams (Wilkerson, Kristi) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before 3/29/2021; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/ copies of #1 petition to Warden Karen Williams & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 3/8/2021. (amf, ) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 4602062450.), filed by James Derril McCray. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Letter, #5 Receipt)(imm, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bart Gregory Harmon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristi O Wilkerson