This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:25:38 (UTC).

McCray v. Weiss et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 McCray filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Weiss. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth A. Marra. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-81633

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth A. Marra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darrin McCray

West Palm Beach, FL 33402

Defendants

Daliah H. Weiss

Dave Aronberg

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All pending motions are denied as moot. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (ir) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) Plaintiff's NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Darrin McCray. (ebz) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (ir) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#4

(#4) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $400.00, filed by Darrin McCray.(cqs) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 12/6/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS900006675 (pcs) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $400.00, filed by Darrin McCray. Not Paid/No IFP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(pcs) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 12/6/2019 (pcs). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All pending motions are denied as moot. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (ir) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Plaintiff's NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Darrin McCray. (ebz) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (ir) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $400.00, filed by Darrin McCray.(cqs) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 12/6/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS900006675 (pcs) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra and Magistrate Judge William Matthewman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $400.00, filed by Darrin McCray. Not Paid/No IFP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(pcs) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 12/6/2019 (pcs). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.