This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:26:01 (UTC).

McCraw v. Bank of America, National Association et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 McCraw filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bank of America, National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00870

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John McCraw, Jr

Defendants

John Does

Bank of America, National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert R. Cortinez, II

Attorney at Cortinez Law Firm

Post Office Box 217

Little Rock, AR 72203

Defendant Attorney

Judy Simmons Henry

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings

200 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201-3699

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Bank of America, National Association.(Henry, Judy) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#3

(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Bank of America, National Association (Henry, Judy) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by John McCraw, Jr.(kdr) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America, National Association from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-7807. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT075105. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Bank of America, National Association.(Henry, Judy) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/13/2019. (rmg) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Bank of America, National Association (Henry, Judy) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by John McCraw, Jr.(kdr) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America, National Association from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-7807. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT075105. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.