This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 07:22:20 (UTC).

McCraner et al v. Wells Fargo & Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 McCraner filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Wells Fargo Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana M. Sabraw, Barbara Lynn Major, Larry Alan Burns and Linda Lopez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01246

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Dana M. Sabraw

Larry Alan Burns

Referral Judges

Barbara Lynn Major

Linda Lopez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John McCraner

Sharon Stiansen

Janet Pollard

Michael Darlington

Susan R. Landreau

John N. Tuffield

Defendants

Wells Fargo & Company

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan M. Rotter

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Lionel Z Glancy

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Garth A. Spencer

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Alicia A. Baiardo

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Anthony Q Le

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

David C. Powell

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

14 #7

Exhibit Exhibit G

14 #6

Exhibit Exhibit F

14 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E

14 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

14 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

14 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

14 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

14 #14

Main Document

13 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support o

13 #13

Main Document

12 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support o

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Le, Anthony) (sjt). (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #7 Stipulated Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint and Modify Motion Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/30/2021. (jmr) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance Alicia A. Baiardo by Alicia A. Baiardo on behalf of Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Baiardo, Alicia)Attorney Alicia A. Baiardo added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney Alicia A. Baiardo added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (jmr). (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance David C. Powell by David C. Powell on behalf of Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Powell, David)Attorney David C. Powell added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney David C. Powell added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (jmr). (Entered: 07/30/2021)

7 #1

[Proposed] Order Granting Stipulated Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond

7 #7

Main Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #13 MOTION to Strike Wells Fargos Notice of Motion to Strike the Nationwide Class Action Claims and Allegations, #12 MOTION to Dismiss Wells Fargos Notice of Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint Wells Fargos Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Motion to Strike the Nationwide Class Action Claims and Allegations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Baiardo, Alicia) (jmr). (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Strike Wells Fargos Notice of Motion to Strike the Nationwide Class Action Claims and Allegations by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Wells Fargos Motion to Strike the Nationwide Class Action Claims and Allegations)(Baiardo, Alicia) (jmr). (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss Wells Fargos Notice of Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Wells Fargos Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint)(Baiardo, Alicia) (jmr). (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Le, Anthony) (sjt). (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #7 Stipulated Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint and Modify Motion Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/30/2021. (jmr) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance Alicia A. Baiardo by Alicia A. Baiardo on behalf of Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Baiardo, Alicia)Attorney Alicia A. Baiardo added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney Alicia A. Baiardo added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (jmr). (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance David C. Powell by David C. Powell on behalf of Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Powell, David)Attorney David C. Powell added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney David C. Powell added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (jmr). (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, Stipulated Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint and Modify Motion Briefing Schedule by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulated Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint and Modify Motion Briefing Schedule)(Le, Anthony)Attorney Anthony Q Le added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Q Le added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) QC Mailer, re: proposed order (jmr). (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Moshe Rotter on behalf of Michael Darlington, Susan R. Landreau, John McCraner, Janet Pollard, Sharon Stiansen, John N. Tuffield (Rotter, Jonathan)Attorney Jonathan Moshe Rotter added to party Michael Darlington(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Moshe Rotter added to party Susan R. Landreau(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Moshe Rotter added to party John McCraner(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Moshe Rotter added to party Janet Pollard(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Moshe Rotter added to party Sharon Stiansen(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Moshe Rotter added to party John N. Tuffield(pty:pla) (jmr). (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw, Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:18-cv-01388-LAB-LL. The new case number is 21CV1246-LAB-LL. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/15/2021. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/14/2021.(zda) (jms). (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Garth A. Spencer on behalf of Michael Darlington, Susan R. Landreau, John McCraner, Janet Pollard, Sharon Stiansen, John N. Tuffield (Spencer, Garth)Attorney Garth A. Spencer added to party Michael Darlington(pty:pla), Attorney Garth A. Spencer added to party Susan R. Landreau(pty:pla), Attorney Garth A. Spencer added to party John McCraner(pty:pla), Attorney Garth A. Spencer added to party Janet Pollard(pty:pla), Attorney Garth A. Spencer added to party Sharon Stiansen(pty:pla), Attorney Garth A. Spencer added to party John N. Tuffield(pty:pla) (zda). (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ekb) (jms). (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Michael Darlington, Susan R. Landreau, John McCraner, Janet Pollard, Sharon Stiansen, John N. Tuffield of case(s) 3:18-cv-01388-LAB-LL; 3:17-cv-02024-LAB-KSC; 3:21-cv-1245-AJB-JLB (CA notified). (ekb) (jms). (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15907043.), filed by John N. Tuffield, Sharon Stiansen, Michael Darlington, Susan R. Landreau, John McCraner, Janet Pollard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1246-DMS-BLM. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Glancy, Lionel)(ekb) (jms). (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alicia Anne Baiardo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Le

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Carlyle Powell