This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2019 at 07:46:44 (UTC).

McCoy v. Whittington et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 McCoy filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Whittington. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark L Hornsby and Elizabeth E Foote. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01066

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth E Foote

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Leroy McCoy

Defendants

Dee Barnett

Julian Whittington

Dillan Porter

Anthony Evans

E Downey

Capt Boyer

Craig Stokes

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 11/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/1/2019. (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint, by Robert Leroy McCoy. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint/petition. Pro Se Response due by 10/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/18/2019. (crt,Williams, L) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

5 #2

Clerk's letter re initial review

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) LETTER from Plaintiff to Court requesting service packet. Clerk sent service packet with the attached Clerk's letter re initial review to plaintiff on 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Clerk's letter re initial review) (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $23.17. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/19/2019. (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Leroy McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Table of Contents

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Dee Barnett, Boyer, E Downey, Anthony Evans, Dillan Porter, Craig Stokes, Julian Whittington with Jury Demand filed by Robert Leroy McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Table of Contents, #3 Exhibit, #4 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • RECEIVED Partial Filing Fee on behalf of Robert Leroy McCoy in the amount of $19.13, receipt number 54635062530. (crt,Reasor, M) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 11/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/1/2019. (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint, by Robert Leroy McCoy. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint/petition. Pro Se Response due by 10/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/18/2019. (crt,Williams, L) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER from Plaintiff to Court requesting service packet. Clerk sent service packet with the attached Clerk's letter re initial review to plaintiff on 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Clerk's letter re initial review) (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • RECEIVED Partial Filing Fee on behalf of Robert Leroy McCoy from Julian C Whittington Sheriff and Ex-Officio Tax Collector in the amount of $4.04, receipt number 54635062331. (crt,Reasor, M) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $23.17. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/19/2019. (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Leroy McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Dee Barnett, Boyer, E Downey, Anthony Evans, Dillan Porter, Craig Stokes, Julian Whittington with Jury Demand filed by Robert Leroy McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Table of Contents, #3 Exhibit, #4 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less