Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/05/2019 at 08:05:40 (UTC).

McCoy v. University of Virginia Medical Center et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 McCoy filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against University of Virginia Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Norman K. Moon and Joel C. Hoppe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00050

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Norman K. Moon

Referral Judge

Joel C. Hoppe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tina M. McCoy

Defendants

Ryan M. Rall

University of Virginia Medical Center

Commonwealth of Virginia

Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia

Charles Wilson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carla Denette Brown

Attorney at Charlson Bredhoft Cohen & Brown, PC

11260 Roger Bacon Drive, Suite 201

Reston, VA 20190

Defendant Attorneys

Edwin Lewis Kincer, Jr.

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Virginia - Richmond

202 North Ninth Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Bret Gregory Daniel

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC.

901 East Byrd Street, Suite 1300

Richmond, VA 23219

Elizabeth Marie Ebanks

Attorney at Ogeltree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

901 East Byrd Street, Suite 1300

Richmond, VA 23219

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER regarding State Court Records - Paper, #14 it is hereby ordered that Defendant Commonwealth of Virginia may file a motion to dismiss under Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and it may raise only those arguments previously asserted in the demurrer. The briefing schedule for the motion to dismiss is as follows: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss November 15, 2019; Plaintiff's Response December 4, 2019; Defendant's Reply December 11, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/31/19. (hnw)

14 #3

Answers and Complaint

14 #2

Part 3

14 #1

Part 2

#14

(#14) Paper State Court Records received from Circuit Court of Albemarle County, CL18-1215, consisting of Part 3 service, objections, interrogatories, Part 2 Notices/Demurrers Answers and Ameded Complaint,, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3Original Answers and Complaint)(hnw) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia of Completion of Briefing (Ebanks, Elizabeth)

#11

(#11) ORDER Adopting the Rule 26(f)Joint Discovery Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/9/19. (hnw)

#10

(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Ebanks, Elizabeth)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Tina M. McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Carla)

#7

(#7) Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Defendant Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia (Ebanks, Elizabeth)

#6

(#6) PRETRIAL ORDER, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/16/19. (hnw)

#5

(#5) Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Albemarle County Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/16/19. (hnw)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ebanks, Elizabeth)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D-Notice of Filing

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Albemarle County Circuit Court, case number CL18-1215. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 paid by e-receipt no. 0423-3220709), filed by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Order, #2 Exhibit B- Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D-Notice of Filing, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • (#17) NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Status Conference Call set for 3/12/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to email counsel dial in information.(kld)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER regarding State Court Records - Paper, #14 it is hereby ordered that Defendant Commonwealth of Virginia may file a motion to dismiss under Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and it may raise only those arguments previously asserted in the demurrer. The briefing schedule for the motion to dismiss is as follows: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss November 15, 2019; Plaintiff's Response December 4, 2019; Defendant's Reply December 11, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/31/19. (hnw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • (#15) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Scheduling Conference Call held in chambers on 10/31/2019. (kld)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • (#13) NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Scheduling Conference Call set for 10/31/2019 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to email parties dial in information.(kld)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Paper State Court Records received from Circuit Court of Albemarle County, CL18-1215, consisting of Part 3 service, objections, interrogatories, Part 2 Notices/Demurrers Answers and Ameded Complaint,, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3Original Answers and Complaint)(hnw) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia of Completion of Briefing (Ebanks, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER Adopting the Rule 26(f)Joint Discovery Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/9/19. (hnw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Ebanks, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • (#9) NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for September 1-4, 2020 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (hnw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Tina M. McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Carla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Defendant Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia (Ebanks, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PRETRIAL ORDER, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/16/19. (hnw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Albemarle County Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/16/19. (hnw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Brief / Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Ebanks, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ebanks, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint Complaint by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia.(Ebanks, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Albemarle County Circuit Court, case number CL18-1215. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 paid by e-receipt no. 0423-3220709), filed by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Order, #2 Exhibit B- Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D-Notice of Filing, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carla Denette Brown