This case was last updated from PACER on 09/05/2020 at 11:08:20 (UTC).

McCoy v. Saul

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 McCoy filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judges overseeing this case are Candy W. Dale and David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00339

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Candy W. Dale

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Michael James McCoy, Jr.

Nampa, ID 83686

Respondent

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Joanne P Rodriguez

Attorney at United States Attorney's office

1290 West Myrtle Street, Suite 500

Boise, ID 83702

Summer Stinson

Attorney at Social Security Administration

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2900, M/S 221A

Seattle, WA 98104-7075

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER of Conditional Filing (ckh)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Summer Stinson on behalf of Andrew Saul (Stinson, Summer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docket(#13) ORDER - ALL MATTERS in the above case are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Candy W. Dale. Judge Dale is directed to conduct all necessary and proper proceedings pertaining thereto. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:20-cv-00339-DCN. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docket(#12) The 21 day deadline has expired. Case will be reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Andrew Saul (Rodriguez, Joanne)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docket(#11) PROCESS RECEIPT and Returned Executed Andrew Saul and U.S. Attorney c/o Joanne Rodriguez served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (jd) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docket(#9) USM form 285 Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Gave 3 copies of form USM form 285, petition, summons and order to USM) (Attachments: #1 Attorney General, #2 Joanne Rodriguez)(jd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2020: #3 Summons for Andrew Saul, #4 Summons for Attorney General, #5 Summons for Joanne Rodriguez) (jd).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docket(#8) ORDER - Petitioners In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt. #7 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Michael James McCoy, Jr. Responses due by 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Balance History)(jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael James McCoy, Jr. is not signed. The filing party shall re-submit their filing completed with signature.(jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Michael James McCoy, Jr re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/28/2020. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER of Conditional Filing (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Social Security Number by Michael James McCoy, Jr. This is a sealed document. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISREGARD APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Michael James McCoy, Jr. Responses due by 7/28/2020. (ckh) Modified on 7/13/2020, not signed see corrective entry (jd).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REVIEW - filed by Michael James McCoy, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B) (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less