This case was last updated from PACER on 01/05/2021 at 07:17:52 (UTC).

MCCOY v. MCLANE COMPANY, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 MCCOY filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against MCLANE COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen M. Williams and Renee Marie Bumb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-15608

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen M. Williams

Presiding Judge

Renee Marie Bumb

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMILAH MCCOY

Defendants

MCLANE COMPANY, INC.

JOHN DOES 1-5 and 6-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TONI L. TELLES

Attorney at Law Offices of Eric A. Shore, P.C.

4 Echelon Plaza, 201 Laurel Road, 8Th Floor

Voorhees, NJ 08043

Defendant Attorneys

TIMOTHY MICHAEL MCCARTHY

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS PC

1601 Cherry Street, Suite 1350

Philadelphia, PA 19102

JOHN MICHAEL NOLAN, JR.

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

1601 Cherry Street, Suite 1350

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by MCLANE COMPANY, INC..(MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#9

(#9) STIPULATED ORDER Granting Defendant an extension of 7 days, to 12/7/2020, to answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/30/2020. (rtm, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond by MCLANE COMPANY, INC.. (MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#7

(#7) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint.. (MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MICHAEL NOLAN, JR on behalf of MCLANE COMPANY, INC. (NOLAN, JOHN) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#5

(#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney TIMOTHY MICHAEL MCCARTHY for MCLANE COMPANY, INC. added. (MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Order Initial Conference set for 2/11/2021 09:30 AM Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/6/2020. (cry, ) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond for by MCLANE COMPANY, INC.. (MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCLANE COMPANY, INC. identifying Berkshire Hathaway Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Notice of Compliance

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MCLANE COMPANY, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey-Salem County, case number SLM-L-000170-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11616464), filed by MCLANE COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Compliance, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by MCLANE COMPANY, INC..(MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATED ORDER Granting Defendant an extension of 7 days, to 12/7/2020, to answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/30/2020. (rtm, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond by MCLANE COMPANY, INC.. (MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application and Order to extend time to answer #7 filed by Timothy McCarthy on 11/25/2020 was submitted incorrectly. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Stipulation to extend time to answer USING the event Stipulation. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmw, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint.. (MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences Magistrate Judge Williams. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (dd, ) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MCLANE COMPANY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/30/2020. (dmr) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MICHAEL NOLAN, JR on behalf of MCLANE COMPANY, INC. (NOLAN, JOHN) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney TIMOTHY MICHAEL MCCARTHY for MCLANE COMPANY, INC. added. (MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Initial Conference set for 2/11/2021 09:30 AM Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/6/2020. (cry, ) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer #3 filed by MCLANE COMPANY, INC. on 11/6/2020 was submitted incorrectly. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE APPLICATION USING Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (cry, ) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences (RMB). #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, ) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketJudge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond for by MCLANE COMPANY, INC.. (MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCLANE COMPANY, INC. identifying Berkshire Hathaway Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MCLANE COMPANY, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey-Salem County, case number SLM-L-000170-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11616464), filed by MCLANE COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Compliance, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCCARTHY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where McLane Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TONI L. TELLES