This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2020 at 08:38:19 (UTC).

McCowan v. Gotec Plus Sun, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 McCowan filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Gotec Plus Sun, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William O. Bertelsman and Candace J. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00134

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William O. Bertelsman

Referral Judge

Candace J. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah McCowan

Defendants

Gotec Plus Sun, LLC

Gotec USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

T. Larry Hicks

Attorney at Cetrulo, Mowery & Hicks P.S.C.

130 Dudley Road, Suite 200

Edgewood, KY 41017

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deborah McCowan. Gotec Plus Sun, LLC waiver sent on 10/22/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Hicks, T.) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Gotec Plus Sun, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#3

(#3) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2020.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 09/23/2020)

1 #2

Summons Gotec Plus Sun, LLC

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4783149), filed by Deborah McCowan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Gotec Plus Sun, LLC)(ECO) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deborah McCowan. Gotec Plus Sun, LLC waiver sent on 10/22/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Hicks, T.) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Gotec Plus Sun, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2020.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketConflict Check run. (ECO) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4783149), filed by Deborah McCowan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Gotec Plus Sun, LLC)(ECO) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer T. Larry Hicks