This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2020 at 13:47:50 (UTC).

McCormick v. Krouse et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 McCormick filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Krouse. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Halil S. Ozerden and John C. Gargiulo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00976

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Halil S. Ozerden

Referral Judge

John C. Gargiulo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mason Montrell McCormick

Parchman, MS 38738

Defendants

Unknown Krouse

Harrison County Board of Supervisors

Harrison County Adult Detention Center

Troy Peterson

Interested Party

Pro Se Department

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

9 #1

Envelope

1 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/19/19. (RLW) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#9

(#9) Response to Order re #8 ORDER, filed by Mason Montrell McCormick (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/19/19. (RLW) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

1 #2

Notice of Assignment

#1

(#1) (COPY) COMPLAINT against Harrison County Adult Detention Center, Harrison County Board of Supervisors, Unknown Krouse, Troy Peterson, filed by Mason Montrell McCormick (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment) (RLW) Modified on 12/18/2019 to add COPY (RLW). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

(#5) Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Mason Montrell McCormick (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Plaintiff Mason Montrell McCormick shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than 2/11/20. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 1/28/20. (RLW) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

5 #1

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Response to Order re #8 ORDER, filed by Mason Montrell McCormick (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Plaintiff Mason Montrell McCormick shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than 2/11/20. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 1/28/20. (RLW) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; *RESTRICTED* granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Clerk is directed to mail copies of this order to the Plaintiff and Premier Supply Link for MDOC Inmate Accounts, P.O. Box 97538, Pearl, Mississippi 39288. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 1/27/20. (RLW) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mason Montrell McCormick (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Mason Montrell McCormick (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/19/19. (RLW) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/19/19. (RLW) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mason Montrell McCormick (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) (COPY) COMPLAINT against Harrison County Adult Detention Center, Harrison County Board of Supervisors, Unknown Krouse, Troy Peterson, filed by Mason Montrell McCormick (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment) (RLW) Modified on 12/18/2019 to add COPY (RLW). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.