This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/08/2021 at 07:32:31 (UTC).

McCormack Baron Salazar, Inc. et al v. USI Insurance Services LLC

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 McCormack Baron Salazar, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against USI Insurance Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Pitlyk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00993

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Pitlyk

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

McCormack Baron Salazar, Inc.

McCormack Baron Management, Inc.

Defendant

USI Insurance Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua M. Schindler

Attorney at THE SCHINDLER LAW FIRM, P.C.

141 N. Meramec Avenue, Suite 201

St. Louis, MO 63105

Brian P. Doty

Attorney at SCHINDLER LAW FIRM

7710 Carondelet Ave., Suite 333

Clayton, MO 63105

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick J. Kenny

Attorney at ARMSTRONG TEASDALE LLP - St Louis

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Edward Joseph Baines

Attorney at SAUL EWING LLP - Baltimore

500 E. Pratt St., Suite 900

Baltimore, MD 21202

Steven M. Dickstein

Attorney at SAUL EWING LLP - Miami

701 Brickell Ave., 17Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131

Nicholas Anthony Cammarata

Attorney at ARMSTRONG TEASDALE LLP - St Louis

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#15

14 #1

Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing (SMD)

#14

13 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#13

#12

#11

#10

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Edward J. Baines. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8870187) by Defendant USI Insurance Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Baines, Edward) filed by USI Insurance Services LLC, AND #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven M. Dickstein. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8870334) by Defendant USI Insurance Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing (SMD))(Dickstein, Steven) filed by USI Insurance Services LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 9/17/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint by USI Insurance Services LLC.(Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven M. Dickstein. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8870334) by Defendant USI Insurance Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing (SMD))(Dickstein, Steven) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Edward J. Baines. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8870187) by Defendant USI Insurance Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Baines, Edward) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff McCormack Baron Salazar, Inc... (Doty, Brian) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff McCormack Baron Management, Inc... (Doty, Brian) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Brian P. Doty for Plaintiffs McCormack Baron Management, Inc., McCormack Baron Salazar, Inc.. (Doty, Brian) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant USI Insurance Services LLC. (Kenny, Patrick) filed by USI Insurance Services LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 8/13/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant USI Insurance Services LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant USI Insurance Services LLC. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas Anthony Cammarata for Defendant USI Insurance Services LLC. (Cammarata, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 8/20/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. (JWD) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by McCormack Baron Salazar, Inc., McCormack Baron Management, Inc..(JWD) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant USI Insurance Services LLC. Parent companies: USI Advantage Corp, Subsidiaries: USI Insurance Services LLC, Publicly held company: USI Insurance Services, LLC,. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant USI Insurance Services LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of St. Louis, case number 2122-CC08810, with receipt number AMOEDC-8801548, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by USI Insurance Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court Unexecuted, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCCORMACK BARON SALAZAR INC . is a litigant

Latest cases where USI Insurance Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Dickstein