This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2021 at 08:31:59 (UTC).

McCollam v. Sunflower Bank, NA

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 McCollam filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sunflower Bank, NA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01484

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karen McCollam

Defendant

Sunflower Bank, NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sophia G. Gold

Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew J. Demko

Ashley Taylor Brines

David Cameron Walker

Douglas Wayne Brown

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

11 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

11 #11

Main Document

#9

#8

#7

6 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

6 #6

Main Document

#5

#3

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A Deposit Agreement

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sophia G. Gold on behalf of Karen McCollamAttorney Sophia G. Gold added to party Karen McCollam(pty:pla) (Gold, Sophia) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ashley Taylor Brines on behalf of Sunflower Bank, NAAttorney Ashley Taylor Brines added to party Sunflower Bank, NA(pty:dft) (Brines, Ashley) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew J. Demko on behalf of Sunflower Bank, NAAttorney Andrew J. Demko added to party Sunflower Bank, NA(pty:dft) (Demko, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Sunflower Bank, NA All parties do not consent.. (Brown, Douglas) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Sunflower Bank, NA may have up to and including 8/21/2021 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/1/2021. Text Only Entry(skclc1) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Sunflower Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Walker, David) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 8/23/2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #3 ) is due on or before 8/23/2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/1/2021. Text Only Entry (amont, ) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Cameron Walker on behalf of Sunflower Bank, NAAttorney David Cameron Walker added to party Sunflower Bank, NA(pty:dft) (Walker, David) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Douglas Wayne Brown on behalf of Sunflower Bank, NAAttorney Douglas Wayne Brown added to party Sunflower Bank, NA(pty:dft) (Brown, Douglas) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen McCollam. Sunflower Bank, NA served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Sunflower Bank, N.A. by Plaintiff Karen McCollam. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Jeffrey Kaliel. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action against Sunflower Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7896653)Attorney Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel added to party Karen McCollam(pty:dft), filed by Karen McCollam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Deposit Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaliel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less