This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2019 at 07:56:06 (UTC).

McClintock v. Association of Apartment Owners of Pearl Ridge Gardens and Pearl Ridge Towers

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 McClintock filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Association of Apartment Owners of Pearl Ridge Gardens and Pearl Ridge Towers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT and WES REBER PORTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00465

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT

Referral Judge

WES REBER PORTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria T. McClintock

Defendants

Association of Apartment Owners of Pearl Ridge Gardens and Pearl Ridge Towers

Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP

Kapono F.H. Kiakona

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael L. Iosua

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St 17Th Floor

Honolulu, HI 96813

Steven K.S. Chung

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St 17Th Floor, 521-9500, Fax: 541-9050

Honolulu, HI 96813

Timothy E. Ho

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St 17Th Floor

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant Attorneys

Jamie Christine S. Madriaga

Attorney at Cox, Wootton, Lerner, Griffin & Hansen LLP

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1099

Honolulu, HI 96813

Duane R. Miyashiro

Attorney at Cox, Wootton, Lerner, Griffin & Hansen LLP

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1099

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Certificate of Service

#19

(#19) DEFENDANTS PORTER MCGUIRE KIAKONA & CHOW, LLP AND KAPONO F. H. KIAKONA'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint FILED SEPTEMBER 11, 2019 by Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyashiro, Duane) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

18 #1

Certificate of Service

#18

(#18) First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyashiro, Duane) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

17 #1

Certificate of Service

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Christine S. Madriaga on behalf of Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP on behalf of Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Madriaga, Jamie Christine) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

16 #1

Certificate of Service

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Duane R. Miyashiro on behalf of Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP on behalf of Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyashiro, Duane) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria T. McClintock. Kapono F.H. Kiakona. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP. (emt, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Kapono F.H. Kiakona. (emt, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Pearl Ridge Gardens and Pearl Ridge Towers. (emt, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Maria T. McClintock Notice of Related Cases Maria T. McClintock. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Maria T. McClintock. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#1

(#19) DEFENDANTS PORTER MCGUIRE KIAKONA & CHOW, LLP AND KAPONO F. H. KIAKONA'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint FILED SEPTEMBER 11, 2019 by Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyashiro, Duane) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • (#20) EO: Based on counsel's request and agreement, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 11/13/2019 to 12/17/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. Plaintiff shall notify any Defendant who has not yet appeared. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) DEFENDANTS PORTER MCGUIRE KIAKONA & CHOW, LLP AND KAPONO F. H. KIAKONA'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint FILED SEPTEMBER 11, 2019 by Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyashiro, Duane) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyashiro, Duane) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Christine S. Madriaga on behalf of Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP on behalf of Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Madriaga, Jamie Christine) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Duane R. Miyashiro on behalf of Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP on behalf of Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyashiro, Duane) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria T. McClintock. Kapono F.H. Kiakona. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria T. McClintock. Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria T. McClintock. Association of Apartment Owners of Pearl Ridge Gardens and Pearl Ridge Towers. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/13/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP. (emt, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Kapono F.H. Kiakona. (emt, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Pearl Ridge Gardens and Pearl Ridge Towers. (emt, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • (#7) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00465 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Maria T. McClintock Notice of Related Cases Maria T. McClintock. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Maria T. McClintock. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Pearl Ridge Gardens and Pearl Ridge Towers ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2260662.), filed by Maria T. McClintock.(Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.