This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 07:53:57 (UTC).

MCCLINTIC v. CITIBANK, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 MCCLINTIC filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against CITIBANK, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nora Barry Fischer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00880

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nora Barry Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHANNON MCCLINTIC

Defendants

CITIBANK, N.A.

WELTMAN, WEINBERG : & REIS CO., LPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua P. Ward

Attorney at J.P. Ward & Associates, LLC

201 South Highland Avenue, Suite 201

Pittsburgh, PA 15206

Kyle H. Steenland

Attorney at J.P. Ward & Associates, LLC

201 South Highland Avenue, Suite 201

Pittsburgh, PA 15206

Defendant Attorney

Richard J. Perr

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP

Four Penn Center, 1600 John F. Kennedy Blvd.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) AMENDED ORDER: Amendment to #2 Order for Statistical Case Closing. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Courts Order of 7/9/21 #2 is VACATED. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) this case is TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, forthwith, as such a transfer is in the interests of justice. Clerk of Court shall mark this case CLOSED. Details more fully stated in the order. (cjo) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER: This case is TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania, forthwith, as such a transfer is in the interests of justice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mark this case CLOSED. Details more fully stated in the order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/9/21. (cjo) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number AR-21-002622 with Jury Demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6600707), filed by WELTMAN, WEINBERG : & REIS CO., LPA, CITIBANK, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to District of Pennsylvania Eastern. (cel) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED ORDER: Amendment to #2 Order for Statistical Case Closing. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Courts Order of 7/9/21 #2 is VACATED. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) this case is TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, forthwith, as such a transfer is in the interests of justice. Clerk of Court shall mark this case CLOSED. Details more fully stated in the order. (cjo) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to District of Pennsylvania Middle. (cel) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: This case is TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania, forthwith, as such a transfer is in the interests of justice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mark this case CLOSED. Details more fully stated in the order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/9/21. (cjo) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number AR-21-002622 with Jury Demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6600707), filed by WELTMAN, WEINBERG : & REIS CO., LPA, CITIBANK, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard J. Perr Esq.