This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 08:04:17 (UTC).

McClendon v. Houston County Jail et al (INMATE 2)

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 McClendon filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Houston County Jail INMATE 2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles S. Coody and W. Harold Albritton, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00819

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles S. Coody

Presiding Judge

W. Harold Albritton, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Benjamin Jermaine McClendon

Clayton, AL 36016

Defendants

Houston County Jail

Sgt. Watson

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) On or before 10/29/2020, Plaintiff shall submit an inmate account statement, as further set out in order; 2) The Clerk SEND a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Ventress Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/15/2020. (Copy furnished as directed)(amf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Benjamin Jermaine McClendon. (hrs, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/14/2020 to attach a corrected PDF document to have the case number reflect southern division) (amf, ). Modified on 10/14/2020 (amf, ). (Entered: 10/13/2020)

1 #1

Supporting Documents

#1

(#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Houston County Jail, Sgt. Watson, filed by Benjamin Jermaine McClendon. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(hrs, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/14/2020 to attach a corrected PDF document to have the case number reflect southern division) (amf, ). Modified on 10/14/2020 (amf, ). (Entered: 10/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) On or before 10/29/2020, Plaintiff shall submit an inmate account statement, as further set out in order; 2) The Clerk SEND a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Ventress Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/15/2020. (Copy furnished as directed)(amf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Benjamin Jermaine McClendon. (hrs, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/14/2020 to attach a corrected PDF document to have the case number reflect southern division) (amf, ). Modified on 10/14/2020 (amf, ). (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Houston County Jail, Sgt. Watson, filed by Benjamin Jermaine McClendon. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(hrs, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/14/2020 to attach a corrected PDF document to have the case number reflect southern division) (amf, ). Modified on 10/14/2020 (amf, ). (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less