This case was last updated from PACER on 04/18/2021 at 09:21:31 (UTC).

McClelland v. Katy Independent School District et al

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 McClelland filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Katy Independent School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00520

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bronson McClelland

Defendants

Katy Independent School District

Armstrong Forensic Laboratory, Inc.

Henry Gaw

Robert Keith Meier

Katy Independent School District Police Department

Stephanie Fulgencio

Kenneth Gregorski

KISD Board of Trustees

Ken Tabor

Justin Graham

joan mcpherson

Courtney Doyle

Ashley Vann

Ashly Darnell

Gary Joseph

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Keith S Donati

Attorney at Donati Brashear Law Firm

410 W. Grand Parkway S., Ste. 104

Katy, TX 77494

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher B Gilbert

Attorney at Thompson & Horton LLP

Phoenix Tower, Suite 2000, 3200 Southwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77027

William K Luyties

Attorney at Lorance & Thompson PC

2900 N Loop W, Ste 500

Houston, TX 77092

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER ON STIPULATION TO ABATE PLAINTIFF'S DEADLIEN TO RESPOND TO THE KATY ISD DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. The Court therefore GRANTS therequest to abate the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to the KISD Defendants Motion to Dismiss[Dkt. 10]. Any requirement that Plaintiff respond to the KISD Defendants Motion to Dismiss[Dkt. 10] will be mooted upon the filing of the KISD Defendants new Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

(#16) STIPULATION re: Abatement of Plaintiff's Deadline to Respond to Katy ISD Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Stephanie Fulgencio, Henry Gaw, Justin Graham, KISD Board of Trustees, Katy Independent School District, Katy Independent School District Police Department, Robert Keith Meier, Ken Tabor, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Christopher) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

15 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Gregorski letter

#15

(#15) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Armstrong Forensic Laboratory, Inc., Stephanie Fulgencio, Henry Gaw, Justin Graham, Kenneth Gregorski, KISD Board of Trustees, Katy Independent School District, Katy Independent School District Police Department, Ken Tabor, Gary Joseph, joan mcpherson, Courtney Doyle, Ashley Vann, Ashly Darnell filed by Bronson McClelland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Gregorski letter)(Donati, Keith) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER on Second #13 Stipulation of Plaintiff and Defendant, Armstrong Forensic Laboratory Inc to Enlarge Time. ( Responses due by 4/20/2021.)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) STIPULATION re: Doc. 3 by Bronson McClelland, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donati, Keith) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER Granting Stipulation of Plaintiff and KISD Defendant to Enlarge Time. Responses due by 4/20/2021.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

11 #1

Proposed Order proposed Order on Stipulation

#11

(#11) STIPULATION re: Doc. 10 by Bronson McClelland, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed Order on Stipulation)(Donati, Keith) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

10 #2

Proposed Order

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Stephanie Fulgencio, Henry Gaw, Justin Graham, Kenneth Gregorski, KISD Board of Trustees, Katy Independent School District, Katy Independent School District Police Department, Robert Keith Meier, Ken Tabor, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Christopher) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Stipulation ; Motion-related deadline set re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal,, and Subject Thereto, ORIGINAL ANSWER ( Responses due by 3/29/2021.)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION by Bronson McClelland, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donati, Keith) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

1 #7

Exhibit G - List of Parties and Counsel

1 #6

Exhibit F - Civil Docket Sheet

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER ON STIPULATION TO ABATE PLAINTIFF'S DEADLIEN TO RESPOND TO THE KATY ISD DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. The Court therefore GRANTS therequest to abate the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to the KISD Defendants Motion to Dismiss[Dkt. 10]. Any requirement that Plaintiff respond to the KISD Defendants Motion to Dismiss[Dkt. 10] will be mooted upon the filing of the KISD Defendants new Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION re: Abatement of Plaintiff's Deadline to Respond to Katy ISD Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Stephanie Fulgencio, Henry Gaw, Justin Graham, KISD Board of Trustees, Katy Independent School District, Katy Independent School District Police Department, Robert Keith Meier, Ken Tabor, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Christopher) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Armstrong Forensic Laboratory, Inc., Stephanie Fulgencio, Henry Gaw, Justin Graham, Kenneth Gregorski, KISD Board of Trustees, Katy Independent School District, Katy Independent School District Police Department, Ken Tabor, Gary Joseph, joan mcpherson, Courtney Doyle, Ashley Vann, Ashly Darnell filed by Bronson McClelland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Gregorski letter)(Donati, Keith) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER on Second #13 Stipulation of Plaintiff and Defendant, Armstrong Forensic Laboratory Inc to Enlarge Time. ( Responses due by 4/20/2021.)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION re: Doc. 3 by Bronson McClelland, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donati, Keith) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Granting Stipulation of Plaintiff and KISD Defendant to Enlarge Time. Responses due by 4/20/2021.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION re: Doc. 10 by Bronson McClelland, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed Order on Stipulation)(Donati, Keith) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Stephanie Fulgencio, Henry Gaw, Justin Graham, Kenneth Gregorski, KISD Board of Trustees, Katy Independent School District, Katy Independent School District Police Department, Robert Keith Meier, Ken Tabor, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Christopher) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Stipulation ; Motion-related deadline set re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal,, and Subject Thereto, ORIGINAL ANSWER ( Responses due by 3/29/2021.)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION by Bronson McClelland, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donati, Keith) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER OF AGREEMENT re: Consolidation of Cases in Federal Court by Stephanie Fulgencio, Henry Gaw, Justin Graham, Kenneth Gregorski, KISD Board of Trustees, Katy Independent School District, Katy Independent School District Police Department, Robert Keith Meier, Ken Tabor, filed.(Gilbert, Christopher) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Armstrong Forensic Laboratory, Inc., filed.(Luyties, William) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Stephanie Fulgencio, Henry Gaw, Justin Graham, Kenneth Gregorski, KISD Board of Trustees, Katy Independent School District, Katy Independent School District Police Department, Robert Keith Meier, Ken Tabor, filed.(Gilbert, Christopher) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bronson McClelland, filed.(Donati, Keith) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal,, and Subject Thereto, ORIGINAL ANSWER by Armstrong Forensic Laboratory, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/15/2021. (Luyties, William) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/14/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fort Bend County 240th Judicial District, case number 21-DCV-279693 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25976172) filed by Robert Keith Meier, Kenneth Gregorski, Ken Tabor, Katy Independent School District Police Department, Katy Independent School District, Stephanie Fulgencio, Justin Graham, KISD Board of Trustees, Henry Gaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Jan 19 Service, #3 Exhibit C - Jan 20 Service, #4 Exhibit D - Armstrong Service, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Answer, #6 Exhibit F - Civil Docket Sheet, #7 Exhibit G - List of Parties and Counsel)(Gilbert, Christopher) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Katy Independant School District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher B Gilbert