This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2023 at 07:57:28 (UTC).

McClellan v. Home Depot Product Authority, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 McClellan filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel E. Butcher and Linda Lopez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00193

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel E. Butcher

Presiding Judge

Linda Lopez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leroy McClellan

Defendant

Home Depot Product Authority, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas James De Santis

Samuel G. Lynn

Defendant Attorney

Robert Kenneth Dixon

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17549961.), filed by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Robert K. Dixon In Support of Home Depot Product Auth, #3 Exhibit 1_Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2_Answer, #5 Exhibit 3_Request for Statement of Damages, #6 Exhibit 4_Plaintiff's Statement of Damages, #7 Exhibit 5_All Other Process and Pleadings and Orders, #8 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:23-cv-193-LL-DEB. Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(ggv) Modified on 2/2/2023 (ggv). (sjt). (Entered: 02/02/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Declaration of Robert K. Dixon In Support of Home Depot Product Auth

1 #3

Exhibit 1_Complaint

1 #4

Exhibit 2_Answer

1 #5

Exhibit 3_Request for Statement of Damages

1 #6

Exhibit 4_Plaintiff's Statement of Damages

1 #7

Exhibit 5_All Other Process and Pleadings and Orders

1 #8

Proof of Service

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate Home Depot, Inc., Other Affiliate Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. for Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 2/2/2023.(ddf) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery And Other Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/9/2023.(ddf) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery And Other Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/9/2023.(ddf) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC (Dixon, Robert) (maq). (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 2/2/2023.(ddf) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate Home Depot, Inc., Other Affiliate Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. for Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17549961.), filed by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Robert K. Dixon In Support of Home Depot Product Auth, #3 Exhibit 1_Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2_Answer, #5 Exhibit 3_Request for Statement of Damages, #6 Exhibit 4_Plaintiff's Statement of Damages, #7 Exhibit 5_All Other Process and Pleadings and Orders, #8 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:23-cv-193-LL-DEB. Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(ggv) Modified on 2/2/2023 (ggv). (sjt). (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less