3:23-CV-00193
02/02/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Other Product Liability
Daniel E. Butcher
Linda Lopez
Leroy McClellan
Home Depot Product Authority, LLC
Thomas James De Santis
Samuel G. Lynn
Robert Kenneth Dixon
(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17549961.), filed by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Robert K. Dixon In Support of Home Depot Product Auth, #3 Exhibit 1_Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2_Answer, #5 Exhibit 3_Request for Statement of Damages, #6 Exhibit 4_Plaintiff's Statement of Damages, #7 Exhibit 5_All Other Process and Pleadings and Orders, #8 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:23-cv-193-LL-DEB. Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(ggv) Modified on 2/2/2023 (ggv). (sjt). (Entered: 02/02/2023)
Civil Cover Sheet
Declaration of Robert K. Dixon In Support of Home Depot Product Auth
Exhibit 1_Complaint
Exhibit 2_Answer
Exhibit 3_Request for Statement of Damages
Exhibit 4_Plaintiff's Statement of Damages
Exhibit 5_All Other Process and Pleadings and Orders
Proof of Service
(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate Home Depot, Inc., Other Affiliate Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. for Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 02/02/2023)
(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 02/02/2023)
(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 2/2/2023.(ddf) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
RESTRICTED
(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery And Other Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/9/2023.(ddf) (Entered: 03/09/2023)
Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery And Other Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/9/2023.(ddf) (Entered: 03/09/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC (Dixon, Robert) (maq). (Entered: 03/03/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 2/2/2023.(ddf) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 02/02/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate Home Depot, Inc., Other Affiliate Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. for Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 02/02/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17549961.), filed by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Robert K. Dixon In Support of Home Depot Product Auth, #3 Exhibit 1_Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2_Answer, #5 Exhibit 3_Request for Statement of Damages, #6 Exhibit 4_Plaintiff's Statement of Damages, #7 Exhibit 5_All Other Process and Pleadings and Orders, #8 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:23-cv-193-LL-DEB. Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(ggv) Modified on 2/2/2023 (ggv). (sjt). (Entered: 02/02/2023)
[-] Read Less