This case was last updated from PACER on 10/28/2019 at 08:28:24 (UTC).

McClellan v. Fluor Enterprises, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2019 McClellan filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Fluor Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C Norton and Bristow Marchant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02453

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Norton

Referral Judge

Bristow Marchant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Latoya McClellan

Defendants

Fluor Enterprises, Inc.

Fluor-Lane South Carolina, LLC

Fluor Craft Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brice E Ricker

Attorney at Wigger Law Firm

8086 Rivers Avenue, Suite A

North Charleston, SC 29406

Defendant Attorneys

Ashley Prickett Cuttino

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart (GREN)

300 North Main Street, Suite 500

Greenville, SC 29601

Piper Reiff Byzet

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart

Po Box 1808

Charleston, SC 29402

Dennis Gregory Placone

Attorney at Harper Lambert PA

Po Box 908

Greenville, SC 29602

Norman Ward Lambert

Attorney at Harper Lambert PA

Po Box 908

Greenville, SC 29602

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/12/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/12/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/13/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/13/2020, Discovery due by 3/13/2020, Motions due by 5/13/2020, Mediation Due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 10/24/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#18

(#18) CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 10/24/2019.(egra, ) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#17

(#17) Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Latoya McClellan.(Ricker, Brice) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#16

(#16) Defendant's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Fluor Craft Services, Inc..(Byzet, Piper) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

15 #1

Proposed Order Confidentiality Order

#15

(#15) Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Fluor Craft Services, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 11/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Confidentiality Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Byzet, Piper) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#14

(#14) Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Fluor Craft Services, Inc..(Byzet, Piper) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

13 #1

Proposed Order Consent Amended Scheduling Order

#13

(#13) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Fluor Craft Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Byzet, Piper) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant, Fluor-Lane South Carolina, LLC ONLY by Latoya McClellan. (Ricker, Brice) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION Correcting Defendant by Latoya McClellan. (Ricker, Brice) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#9

(#9) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/8/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/22/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/22/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/12/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/12/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/13/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/13/2020, Discovery due by 3/13/2020, Motions due by 5/13/2020, Mediation Due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 09/17/2019. (egra, ) Modified on 9/18/2019 to edit docket text (egra, ). (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Fluor-Lane South Carolina, LLC.(Lambert, Norman) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Fluor-Lane South Carolina, LLC.(Cuttino, Ashley) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit State Court Acknowledgement of Removal to Federal Court

#4

(#4) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Charleston County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Acknowledgement of Removal to Federal Court)(Byzet, Piper) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(hada, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

1 #1

State Court Documents

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/12/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/12/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/13/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/13/2020, Discovery due by 3/13/2020, Motions due by 5/13/2020, Mediation Due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 10/24/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 10/24/2019.(egra, ) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Latoya McClellan.(Ricker, Brice) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Defendant's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Fluor Craft Services, Inc..(Byzet, Piper) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Fluor Craft Services, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 11/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Confidentiality Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Byzet, Piper) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Fluor Craft Services, Inc..(Byzet, Piper) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Fluor Craft Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Byzet, Piper) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant, Fluor-Lane South Carolina, LLC ONLY by Latoya McClellan. (Ricker, Brice) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION Correcting Defendant by Latoya McClellan. (Ricker, Brice) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/8/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/22/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/22/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/12/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/12/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/13/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/13/2020, Discovery due by 3/13/2020, Motions due by 5/13/2020, Mediation Due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 09/17/2019. (egra, ) Modified on 9/18/2019 to edit docket text (egra, ). (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Case No. 2:19-2447 is consolidated with Case No. 2:19-2453. The Clerk is directed to close case No. 2:19-2447. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 09/12/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Fluor-Lane South Carolina, LLC.(Lambert, Norman) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Fluor-Lane South Carolina, LLC.(Cuttino, Ashley) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Charleston County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Acknowledgement of Removal to Federal Court)(Byzet, Piper) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(hada, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-10-03811. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8643131), filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Notice of Filing)(hada, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less