This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2021 at 08:03:12 (UTC).

McClellan et al v. Experian Information Solutions Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 McClellan filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roderick C. Young and Lawrence R. Leonard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00586

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roderick C. Young

Referral Judge

Lawrence R. Leonard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ryan McClellan

Amber Goins

Doris Kane

Joseph Kane

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions Inc.

Equifax Information Services LLC

Trans Union LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Joseph Guzzo

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Casey Shannon Nash

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

James Patrick McNichol

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Kristi Cahoon Kelly

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Leonard Anthony Bennett

Attorney at Consumer Litigation Associates

763 J Clyde Morris Boulevard, Suite 1A

Newport News, VA 23601

Defendant Attorneys

David Neal Anthony

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP (Richmond)

Troutman Sanders Bldg, 1001 Haxall Point

Richmond, VA 23219

David Michael Gettings

Attorney at Troutman Pepper (VA Beach)

222 Central Park Ave, Suite 2000

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

Esther Slater McDonald

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP (GA)

1075 Peachtree St Ne, Suite 2500

Atlanta, GA 30309

John Willard Montgomery, Jr.

Attorney at Traylor Montgomery & Elliott PC

130 E Wythe St

Petersburg, VA 23803

Gibson Sinclair Wright

Attorney at McCandlish Holton PC

1111 E Main St, Suite 2100

Richmond, VA 23218-0796

 

Court Documents

21 #1

Proposed Order

#21

(#21) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Second Consent Motion by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#20

(#20) AGREED ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Experian Information Solutions Inc. answer due 1/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 12/17/2021. (tamarm, ) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

19 #1

Exhibit 1 (Proposed Agreed Order)

#19

(#19) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Second Consent Motion for an Extension of Time) by Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Agreed Order))(Anthony, David) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Trans Union LLC shall respond to the Complaint by 12/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 11/24/21. (bpet, ) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

12 #1

Exhibit 1 (Proposed Agreed Order)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan McClellan, Joseph Kane, Doris Kane, Amber Goins Trans Union LLC served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021 (Bennett, Leonard) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan McClellan, Joseph Kane, Doris Kane, Amber Goins Experian Information Solutions Inc. served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021 (Bennett, Leonard) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

5 #1

Civil Motions Procedures

#5

(#5) Three (3) Summonses Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc., Trans Union LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, ) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. #21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (bpet, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Second Consent Motion by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AGREED ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Experian Information Solutions Inc. answer due 1/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 12/17/2021. (tamarm, ) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard: #19 Second Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (bpet, ) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Second Consent Motion for an Extension of Time) by Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Agreed Order))(Anthony, David) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Trans Union LLC shall respond to the Complaint by 12/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 11/24/21. (bpet, ) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Experian Information Solutions, Inc., shall respond to the Complaint by 12/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 11/24/21. (bpet, ) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services LLC shall respond to the Complaint by 1/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 11/24/21. (bpet, ) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Trans Union LLC. (Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, John) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan McClellan, Joseph Kane, Doris Kane, Amber Goins Equifax Information Services LLC served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021 (Bennett, Leonard) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan McClellan, Joseph Kane, Doris Kane, Amber Goins Trans Union LLC served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021 (Bennett, Leonard) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan McClellan, Joseph Kane, Doris Kane, Amber Goins Experian Information Solutions Inc. served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021 (Bennett, Leonard) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Three (3) Summonses Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc., Trans Union LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, ) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, ) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to Equifax Information Services Inc. by Amber Goins, Doris Kane, Joseph Kane, Ryan McClellan. (Bennett, Leonard) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to Experian Information Solutions Inc. by Amber Goins, Doris Kane, Joseph Kane, Ryan McClellan. (Bennett, Leonard) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to Trans Union LLC by Amber Goins, Doris Kane, Joseph Kane, Ryan McClellan. (Bennett, Leonard) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8066914.), filed by Ryan McClellan, Joseph Kane, Doris Kane, Amber Goins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bennett, Leonard) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Esther Slater McDonald